Global Patent Index - EP 1317371 A1

EP 1317371 A1 2003-06-11 - METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR TORQUE CONTROL OF A MACHINE

Title (en)

METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR TORQUE CONTROL OF A MACHINE

Title (de)

VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR DREHMOMENTREGELUNG EINER MASCHINE

Title (fr)

PROCEDE ET DISPOSITIF PERMETTANT DE CORRIGER LE COUPLE D'UNE MACHINE

Publication

EP 1317371 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 00959983 A

Priority

US 0024535 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0220332A1] An exemplary embodiment of the invention is a method for torque control of a PM synchronous machine (105). The method includes obtaining a torque command signal (Tcmd) and a machine speed ( omega m) and determining an operating mode (112, 114) in response to the torque command signal (Tcmd) and the machine speed ( omega ). The operating mode (112, 114) includes a first operating mode (112) and a second operating mode (114). In the first operating mode (112), a stator phase voltage magnitude (V) is computed and an angle ( delta DEG ) between the stator phase voltage (V) and a stator phase check emf (E) is determined in response to the stator phase voltage magnitude (V). In the second operating mode (114), the stator phase voltage (V) is set to a predetermined magnitude (Vm) and the angle ( delta DEG ) between the stator phase voltage (V) and the stator phase back emf (E) is determined in response to the predetermined magnitude.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B62D 5/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B62D 5/04 (2006.01); H02P 6/14 (2006.01); H02P 6/08 (2006.01); H02P 27/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H02P 6/085 (2013.01); H02P 6/15 (2016.02)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

WO 0220332 A1 20020314; EP 1317371 A1 20030611; EP 1317371 A4 20090506; JP 2004508793 A 20040318

INPADOC legal status


2014-05-28 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20131125

2013-08-07 [INTG] ANNOUNCEMENT OF INTENTION TO GRANT

- Effective date: 20130712

2013-07-10 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: H02P 6/14 20060101AFI20130603BHEP

2013-07-10 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: H02P 6/08 20060101ALI20130603BHEP

2012-12-26 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: GM GLOBAL TECHNOLOGY OPERATIONS LLC

2012-12-26 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: STEERING SOLUTIONS IP HOLDING CORPORATION

2012-08-01 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20120627

2011-07-27 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: GM GLOBAL TECHNOLOGY OPERATIONS LLC

2011-01-12 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: GM GLOBAL TECHNOLOGY OPERATIONS, INC.

2009-05-06 [A4] DESPATCH OF SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20090406

2009-05-06 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: B62D 5/04 20060101AFI20020320BHEP

2009-05-06 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: H02P 6/08 20060101ALI20090331BHEP

2004-05-26 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2003-06-11 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030407

2003-06-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE