Global Patent Index - EP 1317384 A1

EP 1317384 A1 2003-06-11 - POURER WITH IMPROVED LOCKING AND CAP EQUIPPED WITH SAME

Title (en)

POURER WITH IMPROVED LOCKING AND CAP EQUIPPED WITH SAME

Title (de)

AUSGUSS MIT VERBESSERTER VERRIEGELUNG UND KAPSEL MIT EINEM SOLCHEN AUSGUSS

Title (fr)

VERSEUR A VERROUILLAGE AMELIORE ET CAPSULE MUNIE DUDIT VERSEUR

Publication

EP 1317384 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 01969879 A

Priority

  • FR 0102831 W
  • FR 0011718 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0222455A1] The invention concerns a pourer (3) associated with a closure cap (1) and designed to be fixed inside a container neck (9), comprising a peripheral skirt (4), a pouring element (8), and means for temporarily assembling said pourer and said closure cap. The invention is characterised in that: a) said peripheral skirt (4) comprises a lower part (5) capable of being radially spaced apart for the pourer to be fixed to the neck; b) the pourer (3) comprises a rigid component (6) axially mobile downwards, inside the peripheral skirt (4); c) the pourer (3) comprises means for causing the lower part (5) and the rigid component (6) to co-operate so as to transform the axial movement of the rigid component (6) into a radial movement of the lower part (1).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65D 47/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65D 47/06 (2006.01); B65D 49/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65D 49/04 (2013.01); B65D 47/061 (2013.01); B65D 47/063 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0222455A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

WO 0222455 A1 20020321; AR 035346 A1 20040512; AT 267748 T 20040615; AU 9001201 A 20020326; BR 0113869 A 20030722; BR 0113869 B1 20110809; CA 2422754 A1 20020321; CZ 20031016 A3 20040512; DE 60103552 D1 20040701; DE 60103552 T2 20050616; DK 1317384 T3 20041004; EP 1317384 A1 20030611; EP 1317384 B1 20040526; FR 2813862 A1 20020315; FR 2813862 B1 20021025; MX PA03002202 A 20030827; NO 20031145 A 20030514; NO 20031145 D0 20030312; NZ 524737 A 20050324; PL 203338 B1 20090930; PL 360586 A1 20040906; PT 1317384 E 20040930; RU 2272765 C2 20060327; US 2004026464 A1 20040212; YU 18703 A 20040312; ZA 200301972 B 20040311

INPADOC legal status


2017-11-30 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20170915

- Year of fee payment: 17

2017-10-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20170925

- Year of fee payment: 17

2017-10-31 [PGFP GR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Payment date: 20170810

- Year of fee payment: 17

2017-10-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20170906

- Year of fee payment: 17

2017-10-31 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Payment date: 20170911

- Year of fee payment: 17

2010-04-30 [PGRI IT] POSTGRANT: PATENT REINSTATED IN CONTRACTING STATE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Effective date: 20091201

2007-12-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *PECHINEY CAPSULES

- Effective date: 20040930

2006-07-14 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20060531

2006-06-14 [REG IE MM4A] PATENT LAPSED

2006-05-31 [REG PT MM4A] ANNULMENT/LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES, SEARCHED AND EXAMINED PATENT

- Effective date: 20060313

2006-05-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060531

2006-05-23 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2006-05-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2006-05-01 [REG DK EBP] EP PATENT LAPSED

2006-04-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060401

2006-03-13 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060313

2005-09-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050930

2005-09-30 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050930

2005-09-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050930

2005-09-30 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050930

2005-09-30 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050930

2005-09-13 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050913

2005-09-12 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050912

2005-09-12 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050912

2005-05-18 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20050301

2005-03-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: PECHINEY CAPSULES

- Effective date: 20040930

2004-11-25 [LTIE] LT: INVALIDATION OF EUROPEAN PATENT OR PATENT EXTENSION

- Effective date: 20040526

2004-10-22 [REG GR EP] EP PATENT VALIDATED IN GREECE

- Document: GR 20040402838

2004-10-04 [REG DK T3] EP PATENT WITH DANISH CLAIMS

2004-09-30 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040930

2004-09-30 [REG PT SC4A] TRANSLATION IS AVAILABLE

- Free text: AVAILABILITY OF NATIONAL TRANSLATION

- Effective date: 20040806

2004-09-15 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20040825

2004-09-14 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2004-09-13 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20040913

- Year of fee payment: 4

2004-09-06 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040906

2004-09-01 [PGFP MC] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Payment date: 20040901

- Year of fee payment: 4

2004-08-26 [PGFP IE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Payment date: 20040826

- Year of fee payment: 4

2004-08-19 [PGFP LU] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Payment date: 20040819

- Year of fee payment: 4

2004-08-13 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: WILLIAM BLANC & CIE CONSEILS EN PROPRIETE INDUSTRI

2004-08-09 [PGFP PT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Payment date: 20040809

- Year of fee payment: 4

2004-07-20 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20040720

- Year of fee payment: 4

2004-07-20 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20040720

- Year of fee payment: 4

2004-07-16 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20040716

- Year of fee payment: 4

2004-07-01 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 60103552 P 20040701

2004-06-30 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: FRENCH

2004-05-28 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2004-05-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2004-05-26 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: RO

2004-05-26 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2004-05-26 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040526

2004-05-26 [PG25 CY] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CY

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040526

2004-05-26 [PG25 TR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: TR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040526

2004-05-19 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: PECHINEY CAPSULES

2003-06-11 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030407

2003-06-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2003-06-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI