Global Patent Index - EP 1317393 A1

EP 1317393 A1 2003-06-11 - DISK BRAKE

Title (en)

DISK BRAKE

Title (de)

TELLERBREMSE

Title (fr)

FREIN ANNULAIRE

Publication

EP 1317393 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 01967346 A

Priority

  • DE 10045420 A
  • EP 0110670 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0222483A1] The invention relates to a disk brake (B) for a thread (Y). Said disk brake has a run-in disk (E) which can be pressed against a stationary run-out disk (A) under the influence of a magnet (M), with a circular braking surface (2). The run-out disk (A) has a central run-out opening (16) for the thread (Y), which is braked between the braking surfaces (2, 14) which are oriented radially in relation to the brake axis (X). The run-in disk (E) is held in the nose area of a storage drum (D) of a thread storage device (F), in a manner that allows the disk to wobble, while the magnet (M) and the run-out disk (A) are held in a stationary support (S). The invention provides that the run-in disk consists of magnetic material and the magnet (M) acts on the run-in disk (E) magnetically through the run-out disk (A), so that the braking force that is exerted on the thread between the braking surfaces can be adjusted and varied.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65H 59/22

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65H 51/22 (2006.01); B65H 59/22 (2006.01); D03D 47/36 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D03D 47/364 (2013.01); B65H 59/225 (2013.01); B65H 2555/13 (2013.01); B65H 2701/31 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0222483A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE CH DE IT LI

EPO simple patent family

WO 0222483 A1 20020321; CN 1189372 C 20050216; CN 1458900 A 20031126; DE 10045420 A1 20020328; EP 1317393 A1 20030611; EP 1317393 B1 20050427

INPADOC legal status


2017-08-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160914

2016-01-29 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20150925

- Year of fee payment: 15

2007-12-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *IROPA A.G.

- Effective date: 20060930

2007-05-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2007-04-03 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070403

2006-09-30 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060930

2006-09-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060930

2006-09-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060930

2006-04-19 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20060130

2005-10-27 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20051027

- Year of fee payment: 5

2005-09-26 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20050926

- Year of fee payment: 5

2005-09-21 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20050921

- Year of fee payment: 5

2005-06-02 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50106047 P 20050602

2005-04-29 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2005-04-29 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: BOVARD AG PATENTANWAELTE

2005-04-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE IT LI

2004-11-17 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE IT LI

2004-05-19 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE IT LI

2003-06-11 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030313

2003-06-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR