Global Patent Index - EP 1317433 A2

EP 1317433 A2 2003-06-11 - INHIBITORS OF GLYCOGEN SYNTHASE KINASE 3

Title (en)

INHIBITORS OF GLYCOGEN SYNTHASE KINASE 3

Title (de)

INHIBITOREN VON GLYCOGEN SYNTHASE KINASE 3

Title (fr)

INHIBITEURS DE GLYCOGENE-SYNTHASE KINASE 3

Publication

EP 1317433 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 01975734 A

Priority

  • US 0142081 W
  • US 23048000 P

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0220495A2] New pyrimidine or pyridine based compounds, compositions and methods of inhibiting the activity of glycogen synthase kinase (GSK3) <i>in vitro</i> and of treatment of GSK3 mediated disorders <i>in vivo</i> are provided. The methods, compounds and compositions of the invention may be employed alone, or in combination with other pharmacologically active agents in the treatment of disorders mediated by GSK3 activity, such as diabetes, Alzheimer's disease and other neurodegenerative disorders, obesity, atherosclerotic cardiovascular disease, essential hypertension, polycystic ovary syndrome, syndrome X, ischemia, traumatic brain injury, bipolar disorder, immunodeficiency or cancer.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C07D 239/42; A61K 31/505; A61P 25/28; C07D 213/74; C07D 213/75; C07D 213/80; C07D 213/85; C07D 401/12; C07D 401/14; C07D 403/12; C07D 405/12; C07D 405/14; C07D 413/14

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C12N 9/99 (2006.01); A61K 31/444 (2006.01); A61K 31/496 (2006.01); A61K 31/505 (2006.01); A61K 31/506 (2006.01); A61K 31/519 (2006.01); A61K 31/5377 (2006.01); A61P 3/04 (2006.01); A61P 3/10 (2006.01); A61P 9/10 (2006.01); A61P 9/12 (2006.01); A61P 15/00 (2006.01); A61P 25/00 (2006.01); A61P 25/18 (2006.01); A61P 25/24 (2006.01); A61P 25/28 (2006.01); A61P 35/00 (2006.01); A61P 37/04 (2006.01); A61P 43/00 (2006.01); C07D 213/64 (2006.01); C07D 213/74 (2006.01); C07D 213/75 (2006.01); C07D 213/80 (2006.01); C07D 213/85 (2006.01); C07D 231/12 (2006.01); C07D 233/60 (2006.01); C07D 235/06 (2006.01); C07D 239/42 (2006.01); C07D 401/04 (2006.01); C07D 401/12 (2006.01); C07D 401/14 (2006.01); C07D 403/12 (2006.01); C07D 403/14 (2006.01); C07D 405/12 (2006.01); C07D 405/14 (2006.01); C07D 409/14 (2006.01); C07D 413/14 (2006.01); C07D 417/14 (2006.01); C07D 471/04 (2006.01); C07D 487/04 (2006.01); C12N 1/38 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C07D 213/74 (2013.01); C07D 213/75 (2013.01); C07D 213/80 (2013.01); C07D 213/85 (2013.01); C07D 239/42 (2013.01); C07D 401/12 (2013.01); C07D 401/14 (2013.01); C07D 403/12 (2013.01); C07D 405/12 (2013.01); C07D 405/14 (2013.01); C07D 413/14 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0220495A3

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

WO 0220495 A2 20020314; WO 0220495 A3 20020620; AU 2001295026 B2 20080403; AU 9502601 A 20020322; CN 100506801 C 20090701; CN 1592743 A 20050309; EP 1317433 A2 20030611; HK 1072936 A1 20100409; JP 2004514656 A 20040520; KR 100816769 B1 20080326; KR 100860827 B1 20080930; KR 20040030404 A 20040409; KR 20080013026 A 20080212

INPADOC legal status


2012-09-26 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20120403

2007-01-24 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: NOVARTIS VACCINES AND DIAGNOSTICS, INC.

2005-07-20 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20050603

2003-08-13 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: NUSS, JOHN, M.

2003-08-13 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: HARRISON, STEPHEN, D.

2003-08-13 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: RING, DAVID, B.

2003-08-13 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: BOYCE, RUSTUM, S.

2003-08-13 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: JOHNSON, KIRK

2003-08-13 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: PFISTER, KEITH, B.

2003-08-13 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: RAMURTHY, SAVITHRI

2003-08-13 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: SEELY, LYNN

2003-08-13 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: WAGMAN, ALLAN, S.

2003-08-13 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: DESAI, MANOJ

2003-08-13 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: LEVINE, BARRY, H.

2003-06-11 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030404

2003-06-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2003-06-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI