Global Patent Index - EP 1317467 A1

EP 1317467 A1 2003-06-11 - 7 HUMAN SECRETED PROTEINS

Title (en)

7 HUMAN SECRETED PROTEINS

Title (de)

7 MENSCHLICHE SEKRETIERTE PROTEINE

Title (fr)

7 PROTEINES HUMAINES SECRETEES

Publication

EP 1317467 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 01903079 A

Priority

  • US 0101383 W
  • US 22808300 P
  • US 25980401 P

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0218411A1] The present invention relates to novel human secreted proteins and isolated nucleic acids containing the coding regions of the genes encoding such proteins. Also provided are vectors, host cells, antibodies, and recombinant methods for producing human secreted proteins. The invention further relates to diagnostic and therapeutic methods useful for diagnosing and treating diseases, disorders, and/or conditions related to these novel human secreted proteins.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C07H 21/04; C07H 21/02; C07K 5/00; C07K 14/00; C07K 14/47; C12N 1/21; C12N 15/63; C12N 15/85; C12N 15/86; C12Q 1/68

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C07K 14/47 (2006.01); C12N 1/21 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C07K 14/47 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

WO 0218411 A1 20020307; AU 3094201 A 20020313; CA 2420320 A1 20020307; EP 1317467 A1 20030611; EP 1317467 A4 20041222

INPADOC legal status


2006-01-18 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20050719

2005-04-20 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20050308

2004-12-22 [A4] DESPATCH OF SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20041105

2004-12-15 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7C 07H 21/04 A

2004-12-15 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7C 07H 21/02 B

2004-12-15 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7C 07K 5/00 B

2004-12-15 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7C 07K 14/00 B

2004-12-15 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7C 12Q 1/68 B

2004-12-15 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7C 12N 1/21 B

2004-12-15 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7C 12N 15/63 B

2004-12-15 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7C 12N 15/85 B

2004-12-15 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7C 12N 15/86 B

2004-12-15 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7C 07K 14/47 B

2003-06-11 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030318

2003-06-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2003-06-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI