Global Patent Index - EP 1317468 A1

EP 1317468 A1 2003-06-11 - 23 HUMAN SECRETED PROTEINS

Title (en)

23 HUMAN SECRETED PROTEINS

Title (de)

23 MENSCHLICHE SEKRETIERTE PROTEINE

Title (fr)

23 PROTEINES HUMAINES SECRETEES

Publication

EP 1317468 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 01904872 A

Priority

  • US 0101397 W
  • US 22628100 P

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0216389A1] The present invention relates to novel human secreted proteins and isolated nucleic acids containing the coding regions of the genes encoding such proteins. Also provided are vectors, host cells, antibodies, and recombinant methods for producing human secreted proteins. The invention further relates to diagnostic and therapeutic methods useful for diagnosing and treating diseases, disorders, and/or conditions related to these novel human secreted proteins.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C07H 21/04; C07K 14/47

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C07K 14/47 (2006.01); C12N 1/21 (2006.01); A61K 38/00 (2006.01); A61K 48/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C07K 14/47 (2013.01); A61K 38/00 (2013.01); A61K 48/00 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

WO 0216389 A1 20020228; AU 3281001 A 20020304; CA 2419306 A1 20020228; EP 1317468 A1 20030611; EP 1317468 A4 20040707

INPADOC legal status


2006-10-04 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20060313

2004-07-07 [A4] DESPATCH OF SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20040521

2004-06-23 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7C 07H 21/04 A

2004-06-23 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7C 07K 14/47 B

2003-08-13 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: ROSEN, CRAIG, A.

2003-08-13 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: KOMATSOULIS, GEORGE, A.

2003-08-13 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: BAKER, KEVIN, P.

2003-08-13 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: BIRSE, CHARLES, E.

2003-08-13 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: SOPPET, DANIEL, R.

2003-08-13 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: OLSEN, HENRIK, S.

2003-08-13 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: MOORE, PAUL, A.

2003-08-13 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: WEI, PING

2003-08-13 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: EBNER, REINHARD

2003-08-13 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: DUAN, D., ROXANNE

2003-08-13 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: SHI, YANGGU

2003-08-13 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: CHOI, GIL, H.

2003-08-13 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: FISCELLA, MICHELE

2003-08-13 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: NI, JIAN

2003-06-11 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030318

2003-06-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2003-06-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI