Global Patent Index - EP 1317471 A1

EP 1317471 A1 2003-06-11 - 21 HUMAN SECRETED PROTEINS

Title (en)

21 HUMAN SECRETED PROTEINS

Title (de)

21 MENSCHLICHE SEKRETIERTE PROTEINE

Title (fr)

21 PROTEINES HUMAINES SECRETEES

Publication

EP 1317471 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 01984534 A

Priority

  • US 0101394 W
  • US 22627800 P
  • US 25980501 P

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0216388A1] The present invention relates to novel human secreted proteins and isolated nucleic acids containing the coding regions of the genes encoding such proteins. Also provided are vectors, host cells, antibodies, and recombinant methods for producing human secreted proteins. The invention further relates to diagnostic and therapeutic methods useful for diagnosing and treating diseases, disorders, and/or conditions related to these novel human secreted proteins.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C12N 15/12; A61K 38/17; C07K 14/435; C12N 5/10; C12N 15/63; C12Q 1/68; G01N 33/50

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C07K 14/47 (2006.01); C12N 1/21 (2006.01); A61K 48/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C07K 14/47 (2013.01); A61K 48/00 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

WO 0216388 A1 20020228; AU 2950701 A 20020304; CA 2418676 A1 20020228; EP 1317471 A1 20030611; EP 1317471 A4 20040721

INPADOC legal status


2005-11-30 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20050531

2005-03-02 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20050118

2004-07-21 [A4] DESPATCH OF SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20040609

2004-07-07 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7C 12N 15/12 A

2004-07-07 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7C 12N 15/63 B

2004-07-07 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7C 07K 14/435 B

2004-07-07 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7C 12N 5/10 B

2004-07-07 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7C 12Q 1/68 B

2004-07-07 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7G 01N 33/50 B

2004-07-07 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7A 61K 38/17 B

2003-07-30 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: ROSEN, CRAIG, A.

2003-07-30 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: KOMATSOULIS, GEORGE, A.

2003-07-30 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: BAKER, KEVIN, P.

2003-07-30 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: BIRSE, CHARLES, E.

2003-07-30 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: SOPPET, DANIEL, R.

2003-07-30 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: OLSEN, HENRIK, S.

2003-07-30 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: MOORE, PAUL, A.

2003-07-30 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: WEI, PING

2003-07-30 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: EBNER, REINHARD

2003-07-30 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: DUAN, D., ROXANNE

2003-07-30 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: SHI, YANGGU

2003-07-30 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: CHOI, GIL, H.

2003-07-30 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: FISCELLA, MICHELE

2003-07-30 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: NI, JIAN

2003-06-11 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030318

2003-06-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2003-06-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI