Global Patent Index - EP 1317521 A1

EP 1317521 A1 2003-06-11 - METHOD OF MAKING DETERGENT COMPOSITIONS COMPRISING ALPHA-SULFOFATTY ACID ESTERS

Title (en)

METHOD OF MAKING DETERGENT COMPOSITIONS COMPRISING ALPHA-SULFOFATTY ACID ESTERS

Title (de)

VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG ALPHA-SULFOFETTSÄUREESTER-HALTIGEN TENSIDZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN

Title (fr)

PROCEDE DE PRODUCTION DES COMPOSITIONS DÉTERGENTES COMPRENANT D'ESTERS D'ACIDE GRAS SULFONE ALPHA

Publication

EP 1317521 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 01937582 A

Priority

  • US 0116234 W
  • US 57476400 A
  • US 70425600 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0190284A1] Compositions and methods of making compositions comprising alpha -sulfofatty acid ester and other detergent components. The alpha -sulfofatty acid ester is formed into a first portion, and the other detergent components are formed into a second portion. The first portion is post-added to the second portion.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C11D 1/28; C11D 1/83; C11D 3/08; C11D 3/10; C11D 3/386

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C11D 1/28 (2006.01); C11D 1/65 (2006.01); C11D 11/00 (2006.01); C11D 11/02 (2006.01); C11D 1/52 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C11D 3/1246 (2013.01); C11D 1/28 (2013.01); C11D 1/65 (2013.01); C11D 11/00 (2013.01); C11D 11/02 (2013.01); C11D 17/06 (2013.01); C11D 1/526 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

WO 0190284 A1 20011129; WO 0190284 A9 20081218; AT 425241 T 20090315; AU 2001263300 A8 20090115; AU 6330001 A 20011203; CA 2412252 A1 20011129; CA 2412252 C 20130108; DE 60137945 D1 20090423; DK 1317521 T3 20090706; EP 1317521 A1 20030611; EP 1317521 A4 20030709; EP 1317521 B1 20090311; ES 2324202 T3 20090803; PT 1317521 E 20090617; US 2004248758 A1 20041209; US 2008070821 A1 20080320; US 6780830 B1 20040824

INPADOC legal status


2017-10-04 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

- Free text: REGISTERED BETWEEN 20170907 AND 20170913

2017-09-27 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

- Free text: REGISTERED BETWEEN 20170831 AND 20170906

2017-08-31 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20170529

- Year of fee payment: 17

2017-08-31 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20170601

- Year of fee payment: 17

2017-08-31 [PGFP PT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Payment date: 20170510

- Year of fee payment: 17

2017-08-31 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20170530

- Year of fee payment: 17

2017-07-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20170530

- Year of fee payment: 17

2017-07-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20170525

- Year of fee payment: 17

2017-07-31 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20170527

- Year of fee payment: 17

2017-05-25 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-08-31 [PGRI PT] POSTGRANT: PATENT REINSTATED IN CONTRACTING STATE

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Effective date: 20160511

2016-05-30 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 16

2016-05-16 [REG PT NF4A] RESTITUTIO IN INTEGRUM

- Free text: RESTITUTIO IN INTEGRUM

- Effective date: 20160511

2016-04-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20151201

2016-04-29 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150601

2016-04-29 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150531

2016-04-29 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150518

2016-03-04 [REG GR ML] LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES

- Document: GR 20090401528

- Effective date: 20151208

2016-02-29 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20151118

2016-02-24 [REG IE MM4A] PATENT LAPSED

2016-02-03 [REG NL MM] LAPSED BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20150601

2016-01-29 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20151208

2015-12-21 [REG DK EBP] PATENT LAPSED

- Effective date: 20150531

2015-12-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 60137945

2015-11-25 [REG PT MM4A] ANNULMENT/LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES, SEARCHED AND EXAMINED PATENT

- Free text: LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES

- Effective date: 20151118

2015-06-01 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 15

2014-09-30 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20140425

- Year of fee payment: 14

2014-08-29 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20140513

- Year of fee payment: 14

2014-08-29 [PGFP GR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Payment date: 20140429

- Year of fee payment: 14

2014-08-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20140602

- Year of fee payment: 14

2014-07-31 [PGFP IE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Payment date: 20140430

- Year of fee payment: 14

2011-09-30 [PG25 CY] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CY

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20090311

2011-08-31 [PG25 TR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: TR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20090311

2011-04-29 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090518

2011-03-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20090311

2010-02-17 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20091214

2009-12-31 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090531

2009-10-01 [NLT2] NL: MODIFICATIONS (OF NAMES), TAKEN FROM THE EUROPEAN PATENT PATENT BULLETIN

- Owner name: THE SUN PRODUCTS CORPORATION

- Effective date: 20090729

2009-09-01 [NLT1] NL: MODIFICATIONS OF NAMES REGISTERED IN VIRTUE OF DOCUMENTS PRESENTED TO THE PATENT OFFICE PURSUANT TO ART. 16 A, PARAGRAPH 1

- Owner name: THE SUN PRODUCTS CORPORATION

2009-08-31 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20090311

2009-08-21 [REG FR CA] CHANGE OF ADDRESS

2009-08-21 [REG FR CD] CHANGE OF NAME OR COMPANY NAME

2009-08-21 [REG FR CJ] CHANGE IN LEGAL FORM

2009-08-03 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2324202 T3

2009-07-31 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20090311

2009-07-29 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: THE SUN PRODUCTS CORPORATION

2009-07-13 [REG GR EP] EP PATENT VALIDATED IN GREECE

- Document: GR 20090401528

2009-07-07 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2009-07-06 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

2009-06-30 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: ISLER & PEDRAZZINI AG

2009-06-30 [REG CH PFA] NAME/FIRM CHANGED

- Owner name: THE SUN PRODUCTS CORPORATION

- Free text: HUISH DETERGENTS, INC.#SUITE 1400, 15 WEST SOUTH TEMPLE#SALT LAKE CITY, UT 84101 (US) -TRANSFER TO- THE SUN PRODUCTS CORPORATION#60 DANBURY ROAD#WILTON, CONNECTICUT 06897 (US)

2009-06-17 [REG PT SC4A] TRANSLATION IS AVAILABLE

- Free text: AVAILABILITY OF NATIONAL TRANSLATION

- Effective date: 20090609

2009-04-23 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 60137945 P 20090423

2009-04-15 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

2009-03-13 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2009-03-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2009-03-11 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2008-05-14 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: METHOD OF MAKING DETERGENT COMPOSITIONS COMPRISING ALPHA-SULFOFATTY ACID ESTERS

2005-08-10 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20050627

2003-07-09 [A4] DESPATCH OF SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20030522

2003-07-02 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7C 11D 1/28 A

2003-07-02 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7C 11D 1/83 B

2003-07-02 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7C 11D 3/08 B

2003-07-02 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7C 11D 3/10 B

2003-07-02 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7C 11D 3/386 B

2003-07-02 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7C 11D 1/65 B

2003-07-02 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7C 11D 11/02 B

2003-06-11 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20021217

2003-06-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2003-06-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI