Global Patent Index - EP 1317534 A1

EP 1317534 A1 2003-06-11 - SPECTRAL CHEMISTRY

Title (en)

SPECTRAL CHEMISTRY

Title (de)

SPEKTRALE CHEMIE

Title (fr)

CHIMIE SPECTRALE

Publication

EP 1317534 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 01970801 A

Priority

  • US 0128392 W
  • US 23162000 P

Abstract (en)

[origin: CA2420749A1] Published without an

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C12N 13/00; C07C 1/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B01J 8/00 (2006.01); B01J 19/00 (2006.01); B01J 19/08 (2006.01); B01J 19/10 (2006.01); B01J 19/12 (2006.01); B01J 23/42 (2006.01); B01J 35/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B01J 19/10 (2013.01); B01J 8/001 (2013.01); B01J 19/0033 (2013.01); B01J 19/08 (2013.01); B01J 19/12 (2013.01); B01J 23/42 (2013.01); B01J 35/0033 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

WO 0222797 A2 20020321; WO 0222797 A9 20020919; AU 9076801 A 20020326; CA 2420749 A1 20020321; CN 102962017 A 20130313; CN 1388828 A 20030101; EP 1317534 A1 20030611; EP 1317534 A4 20060322; IL 149551 D0 20021110; JP 2004508921 A 20040325

INPADOC legal status


2012-07-11 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20120117

2009-06-24 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20090527

2006-08-30 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: GR INTELLECTUAL RESERVE, LLC

2006-03-22 [A4] DESPATCH OF SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20060206

2003-06-11 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030307

2003-06-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2003-06-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT MK RO SI