Global Patent Index - EP 1317542 A2

EP 1317542 A2 2003-06-11 - NUCLEAR RECEPTOR L66 AND METHODS OF USE

Title (en)

NUCLEAR RECEPTOR L66 AND METHODS OF USE

Title (de)

KERNREZEPTOR L66 UND VERFAHREN ZU DEREN VERWENDUNG

Title (fr)

RECEPTEUR NUCLEAIRE L66 ET SES METHODES D'UTILISATION

Publication

EP 1317542 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 01982261 A

Priority

  • EP 01982261 A
  • EP 0110323 W
  • EP 00120370 A
  • EP 01111658 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0222817A2] The present invention relates to a novel nuclear receptor called "L66" or also FXR- beta a homologue of the FXR- alpha , a prototypical type 2 nuclear receptor. The invention also relates to the isolated nucleic acid sequence of L66 and the isolated protein thereof. The invention further relates to processes for isolating and/or producing the nucleic acid or the protein as well as methods of use of the receptor L66.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C12N 15/12; A61K 31/7088; A61K 39/395; A61K 48/00; C07K 14/705; C07K 16/28; C12N 5/10; C12N 15/11; C12Q 1/68; G01N 33/68

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A61K 31/7088 (2006.01); A61K 39/395 (2006.01); A61K 48/00 (2006.01); C07K 14/705 (2006.01); C07K 16/28 (2006.01); C12N 5/10 (2006.01); C12N 15/11 (2006.01); C12N 15/12 (2006.01); C12Q 1/68 (2006.01); G01N 33/68 (2006.01); A61K 38/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C07K 14/70567 (2013.01); A61K 38/00 (2013.01); A61K 48/00 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0222817A3

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

WO 0222817 A2 20020321; WO 0222817 A3 20030327; AU 1389302 A 20020326; CA 2420932 A1 20020321; EP 1317542 A2 20030611

INPADOC legal status


2004-07-07 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20031219

2003-09-24 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030807

2003-09-17 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: LION BIOSCIENCE AG

2003-07-23 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: CASARI, GEORG

2003-07-23 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: HOEFER, MICHAEL

2003-07-23 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: JACKSON, DAVID

2003-07-23 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: KRANZ, HARALD

2003-07-23 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: OTTE, KERSTIN

2003-07-23 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: REMMEL, BETTINA

2003-07-23 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: SUCKOW, JOERG

2003-06-11 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030213

2003-06-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2003-06-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI