Global Patent Index - EP 1317558 A2

EP 1317558 A2 2003-06-11 - A METHOD FOR PRODUCING PLANTS WHICH ARE RESISTANT TO CLOSTEROVIRUSES

Title (en)

A METHOD FOR PRODUCING PLANTS WHICH ARE RESISTANT TO CLOSTEROVIRUSES

Title (de)

VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON CLOSTEROVIRUS-RESISTENTEN PFLANZEN

Title (fr)

PROCEDE DE PRODUCTION DE PLANTES RESISTANTES AUX CLOSTEROVIRUS

Publication

EP 1317558 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 01975038 A

Priority

  • EP 01975038 A
  • EP 00203191 A
  • NL 0100678 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1188833A1] A method for producing cucumber plants which are resistant to cucumber closteroviruses. The method comprises the steps of providing a Cucumis sativus plant which contains alleles that confer resistance to the closteroviruses defined by two QTLs, crossing said C. sativus plant with C. sativus culture breeding material, collecting the seeds resulting from said cross, regenerating the seeds into plants, evaluating the plants for resistance to the closteroviruses, and identifying and selecting resistant plants. Further, a resistant cucumber plant produced by the method as well as fruit or seed produced by said plant.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C12N 15/82; A01H 5/00; C12Q 1/68

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A01H 5/00 (2006.01); A01H 1/04 (2006.01); A01H 5/08 (2006.01); C12N 15/82 (2006.01); C12Q 1/68 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A01H 5/08 (2013.01); A01H 1/04 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0222836A3

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1188833 A1 20020320; AT 393233 T 20080515; AU 9440701 A 20020326; DE 60133750 D1 20080605; DE 60133750 T2 20090514; EP 1317558 A2 20030611; EP 1317558 B1 20080423; EP 1992221 A1 20081119; EP 2292775 A2 20110309; EP 2292775 A3 20110420; ES 2211361 A1 20040701; ES 2211361 B1 20051216; ES 2304131 T3 20080916; JP 2004508829 A 20040325; JP 2012213409 A 20121108; JP 5599541 B2 20141001; JP 5706858 B2 20150422; PT 1317558 E 20080715; US 2004006790 A1 20040108; US 2008189811 A1 20080807; US 7348467 B2 20080325; US 8759622 B2 20140624; WO 0222836 A2 20020321; WO 0222836 A3 20020808

INPADOC legal status


2012-03-01 [REG DE R107] PUBLICATION OF GRANT OF EUROPEAN PATENT RESCINDED

- Document: DE 60133750

- Effective date: 20120301

2012-01-31 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20110927

- Year of fee payment: 11

2012-01-11 [27W] PATENT REVOKED

- Effective date: 20110722

2012-01-11 [GBPR] GB: PATENT REVOKED UNDER ART. 102 OF THE EP CONVENTION DESIGNATING THE UK AS CONTRACTING STATE

- Effective date: 20110722

2012-01-09 [REG PT MP4A] REFUSAL OF NATIONAL PROTECTION

- Effective date: 20120104

2011-12-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20110927

- Year of fee payment: 11

2011-12-30 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20110929

- Year of fee payment: 11

2011-11-30 [PGFP TR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: TR

- Payment date: 20110819

- Year of fee payment: 11

2011-11-30 [PGFP PT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Payment date: 20110819

- Year of fee payment: 11

2011-11-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20110926

- Year of fee payment: 11

2011-11-30 [PGFP GR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Payment date: 20110927

- Year of fee payment: 11

2011-11-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20111005

- Year of fee payment: 11

2011-11-30 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Payment date: 20110928

- Year of fee payment: 11

2011-11-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20110926

- Year of fee payment: 11

2011-07-22 [REG DE R064] EPO'S REVOCATION DECISION NOW FINAL

- Document: DE 60133750

2011-07-22 [REG DE R103] PATENT REVOKED BY EPO

- Document: DE 60133750

2011-07-06 [R26] OPPOSITION FILED (CORRECTION)

- Opponent name: NUNHEMS BV, NUNHEMS BV

- Effective date: 20090120

2011-02-28 [PGFP CY] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CY

- Payment date: 20100830

- Year of fee payment: 10

2011-02-28 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20100929

- Year of fee payment: 10

2010-11-24 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: MONSANTO INVEST N.V.

2010-07-30 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080914

2009-10-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080930

2009-10-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080930

2009-07-31 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080914

2009-05-06 [NLR1] NL: OPPOSITION HAS BEEN FILED WITH THE EPO

- Opponent name: NUNHEMS BV, NUNHEMS BV

2009-04-30 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080930

2009-04-30 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2009-02-25 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: NUNHEMS BV, NUNHEMS BV

- Effective date: 20090120

2009-01-30 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20080423

2009-01-30 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20080723

2009-01-02 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2008-11-28 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20080423

2008-09-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2304131 T3

2008-07-16 [REG GR EP] EP PATENT VALIDATED IN GREECE

- Document: GR 20080401493

2008-07-15 [REG PT SC4A] TRANSLATION IS AVAILABLE

- Free text: AVAILABILITY OF NATIONAL TRANSLATION

- Effective date: 20080703

2008-06-11 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: LANGUAGE OF EP DOCUMENT: FRENCH

2008-06-05 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 60133750 P 20080605

2008-05-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2008-04-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2008-04-23 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2008-03-26 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: DE RUITER SEEDS R&D B.V.

2007-04-18 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20070320

2003-06-11 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030307

2003-06-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2003-06-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI