Global Patent Index - EP 1317575 A2

EP 1317575 A2 2003-06-11 - SELF-CLEANING IRON

Title (en)

SELF-CLEANING IRON

Title (de)

SELBSTREINIGENDES DAMPFBÜGELEISEN

Title (fr)

FER A VAPEUR AUTO NETTOYANT

Publication

EP 1317575 A2 (FR)

Application

EP 01984659 A

Priority

  • FR 0011562 A
  • IB 0102531 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0222939A2] The invention concerns a flash iron comprising a water reservoir (2), a flash chamber (32) and a drip device having an axially mobile rod (4) whereof the total stroke comprises a first travel enabling the steam to flow towards the orifice (520) of a module (5) and a second travel moving the module (5) by opening a wider orifice (220) for water passing from the reservoir (2) to the flash chamber (32). The invention is characterised in that the tightness between the reservoir (2), the module (5) and the flash chamber (32) is provided by a first compressed seal, and the tightness between the rod and the module is provided by a second compressed seal, the two seals being parts of one and the same elastomeric component (52) borne by the module (5).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D06F 75/18

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D06F 75/18 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D06F 75/18 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0222939A3

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

WO 0222939 A2 20020321; WO 0222939 A3 20020822; AU 2237302 A 20020326; CN 1454270 A 20031105; EP 1317575 A2 20030611; FR 2813894 A1 20020315; FR 2813894 B1 20021206; JP 2004508855 A 20040325; US 2003177673 A1 20030925; US 6725586 B2 20040427

INPADOC legal status


2015-09-02 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20150401

2014-04-04 [REG HK WD] APPLICATIONS WITHDRAWN, DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN, OR REFUSED AFTER PUBLICATION IN HONG KONG

- Document: HK 1056002

2007-04-04 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20050606

2005-07-20 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20050606

2003-06-11 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030213

2003-06-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2003-06-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI