Global Patent Index - EP 1317582 A1

EP 1317582 A1 2003-06-11 - METHOD FOR CORRECTING THE POSITION OF A SLAB CONSTRUCTION CONSISTING OF PRECAST CONCRETE SLABS

Title (en)

METHOD FOR CORRECTING THE POSITION OF A SLAB CONSTRUCTION CONSISTING OF PRECAST CONCRETE SLABS

Title (de)

VERFAHREN ZUR LAGEKORREKTUR EINER PLATTENKONSTRUKTION AUS BETONFERTIGTEILPLATTEN

Title (fr)

PROCEDE POUR CORRIGER LA POSITION D'UN CONSTRUCTION REALISEE A PARTIR DE PLAQUES PREFABRIQUEES EN BETON

Publication

EP 1317582 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 01978280 A

Priority

  • DE 10045327 A
  • DE 10064748 A
  • EP 0109544 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0222957A1] The invention relates to a method for correcting the position of a slab construction, especially a solid carriageway for high-speed vehicles, consisting of precast concrete slabs (1). The precast slabs (1) are supported by a substructure made from a hardenable underpoured material (4) and a supporting layer (5) on the base. In order to correct the position of at least one precast slab (1), the precast slab (1) is at least partially detached from the substructure, especially from the under poured material (4) and/or the supporting layer (5), whereupon it is finely aligned and then underpoured once more with said material (4). A separating device (20,21) is arranged on a precast concrete slab (1) which is to be detached on a successive precast concrete slab in a device provided with one such separating device in order to detach at least one part of a concrete slab (1) pertaining to a solid carriageway for high speed vehicles from the substructure thereof, especially when the position is corrected.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E01B 29/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E01B 37/00 (2006.01); E01B 29/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E01B 29/04 (2013.01); E01B 2204/06 (2013.01); E01B 2204/13 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0222957A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

WO 0222957 A1 20020321; WO 0222957 B1 20020725; AT 343019 T 20061115; AU 1044502 A 20020326; BG 107582 A 20031231; BG 64487 B1 20050430; BR 0113806 A 20040217; CA 2422096 A1 20030311; CN 1214157 C 20050810; CN 1474898 A 20040211; CZ 20030627 A3 20030813; DE 50111286 D1 20061130; EA 004007 B1 20031225; EA 200300365 A1 20030828; EE 200300097 A 20050415; EP 1317582 A1 20030611; EP 1317582 B1 20061018; HU 0301554 A2 20030929; IL 154753 D0 20031031; JP 2004509249 A 20040325; JP 3829119 B2 20061004; PL 360874 A1 20040920; SK 2872003 A3 20030805; US 2004099750 A1 20040527

INPADOC legal status


2017-07-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20170301

2017-03-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 50111286

2016-05-31 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150818

2016-04-15 [REG AT MM01] LAPSE BECAUSE OF NOT PAYING ANNUAL FEES

- Document: AT 343019 T

- Effective date: 20150818

2015-10-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20150707

- Year of fee payment: 15

2014-11-28 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20140826

- Year of fee payment: 14

2014-04-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130831

2014-04-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130831

2014-03-31 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2011-10-31 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20110822

- Year of fee payment: 11

2009-09-30 [PG25 TR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: TR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20061018

2009-08-31 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070818

2009-08-31 [PG25 CY] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CY

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20061018

2008-11-28 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20061018

2008-08-29 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070831

2008-04-30 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070831

2008-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20070601

2008-04-30 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20070119

2008-02-29 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: MAX BOGL BAUUNTERNEHMUNG G.M.B.H. & CO. KG

- Effective date: 20070831

2007-11-24 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20061018

2007-09-26 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20070719

2007-06-27 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

2007-06-01 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2007-05-16 [GBV] GB: EP PATENT (UK) TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID IN ACCORDANCE WITH GB SECTION 77(7)/1977

- Effective date: 20061018

2007-04-02 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2007-03-26 [LTIE] LT: INVALIDATION OF EUROPEAN PATENT OR PATENT EXTENSION

- Effective date: 20061018

2007-03-19 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20070319

2007-01-29 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20070129

2007-01-18 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20070118

2007-01-18 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20070118

2006-11-30 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50111286 P 20061130

2006-11-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2006-11-15 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: LANGUAGE OF EP DOCUMENT: GERMAN

2006-10-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2006-10-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: LT LV MK RO

2006-10-18 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2006-10-18 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20061018

2006-10-18 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20061018

2006-10-18 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20061018

2006-10-18 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20061018

2006-06-14 [RAX] REQUESTED EXTENSION STATES OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT HAVE CHANGED

- Payment date: 20030213

- Countries: LT

2006-06-14 [RAX] REQUESTED EXTENSION STATES OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT HAVE CHANGED

- Payment date: 20030213

- Countries: LV

2006-06-14 [RAX] REQUESTED EXTENSION STATES OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT HAVE CHANGED

- Payment date: 20030213

- Countries: MK

2006-06-14 [RAX] REQUESTED EXTENSION STATES OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT HAVE CHANGED

- Payment date: 20030213

- Countries: RO

2006-06-07 [RAX] REQUESTED EXTENSION STATES OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT HAVE CHANGED

- Payment date: 20030213

- Countries: LT

2006-06-07 [RAX] REQUESTED EXTENSION STATES OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT HAVE CHANGED

- Payment date: 20030213

- Countries: LV

2006-06-07 [RAX] REQUESTED EXTENSION STATES OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT HAVE CHANGED

- Payment date: 20030213

- Countries: MK

2006-06-07 [RAX] REQUESTED EXTENSION STATES OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT HAVE CHANGED

- Payment date: 20030213

- Countries: RO

2006-06-07 [RAX] REQUESTED EXTENSION STATES OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT HAVE CHANGED

- Payment date: 20030213

- Countries: SI

2006-05-03 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: METHOD FOR CORRECTING THE POSITION OF A SLAB CONSTRUCTION CONSISTING OF PRECAST CONCRETE SLABS

2003-06-11 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030213

2003-06-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2003-06-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI