Global Patent Index - EP 1317585 A1

EP 1317585 A1 2003-06-11 - METHOD AND SYSTEM FOR MECHANICAL AND MULTIPLE FLUIDIC COUPLING OF A TOOL ON A TOOL-BEARING FRAME

Title (en)

METHOD AND SYSTEM FOR MECHANICAL AND MULTIPLE FLUIDIC COUPLING OF A TOOL ON A TOOL-BEARING FRAME

Title (de)

VERFAHREN UND ANORDUNG ZU MECHANISCHER UND MEHRKANALFLUIDISCHER KUPPLUNG ZWICHEN WERKZEUG UND TRÄGERGERÄT

Title (fr)

PROCEDE ET SYSTEME D'ACCOUPLEMENT MECANIQUE ET MULTIFLUIDIQUE D'UN OUTIL SUR UN CADRE PORTE-OUTIL

Publication

EP 1317585 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 01967446 A

Priority

  • FR 0102778 W
  • FR 0011441 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0220906A1] The invention concerns a system wherein the tool-bearing frame (1) and the tool (2) are each equipped with a multiple fluidic connection box, for example hydraulic (3a, 3b) provided with complementary male-female connecting members; each of said boxes (3a, 3b) is provided with a mobile and retractable protective cover, which normally covers the connecting members contained in said box. Said covers are arranged such that, in a first phase, the proper positioning of the tool-bearing-frame (1) opposite the tool (2) automatically causes the covers (5a, 5b) to retract, directly matching the fluidic connection members of the two boxes (3a, 3b), so as to enable subsequently, in the second and third phases, the mechanical followed by the fluidic connection of the tool-bearing frame and the tool. The system protects the connecting members from the outside environment, while enabling easy and secure connection of the tool with the tool-bearing frame, without any risk of deterioration of the fluidic connectors. The invention is applicable to public works equipment or to hydraulic loaders in agriculture.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E02F 3/36

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E02F 3/40 (2006.01); E02F 3/36 (2006.01); E02F 9/22 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E02F 3/3622 (2013.01); E02F 3/3654 (2013.01); E02F 3/3663 (2013.01); E02F 9/2271 (2013.01); E02F 9/2275 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0220906A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

WO 0220906 A1 20020314; AT 263870 T 20040415; AU 2001287825 B2 20070104; AU 8782501 A 20020322; DE 60102711 D1 20040513; DE 60102711 T2 20050331; DK 1317585 T3 20040809; EP 1317585 A1 20030611; EP 1317585 B1 20040407; ES 2218447 T3 20041116; FR 2813941 A1 20020315; FR 2813941 B1 20030516; JP 2004508472 A 20040318; NZ 524628 A 20050429; US 6899509 B1 20050531

INPADOC legal status


2018-02-28 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20171121

- Year of fee payment: 17

2018-02-28 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20171002

- Year of fee payment: 17

2018-02-28 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20171002

- Year of fee payment: 17

2018-02-28 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20171009

- Year of fee payment: 17

2018-01-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20171002

- Year of fee payment: 17

2018-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20171116

- Year of fee payment: 17

2017-10-02 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-09-28 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 16

2013-01-31 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110907

2012-12-15 [REG AT MM01] LAPSE BECAUSE OF NOT PAYING ANNUAL FEES

- Document: AT 263870 T

- Effective date: 20110907

2011-01-31 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090930

2010-11-30 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20100927

- Year of fee payment: 10

2010-07-30 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100401

2010-05-10 [REG DK EBP] EP PATENT LAPSED

2010-04-21 [REG NL V1] LAPSED BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20100401

2008-11-28 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20080925

- Year of fee payment: 8

2008-10-31 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20080912

- Year of fee payment: 8

2008-01-02 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040907

2007-12-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: S.A. *MAILLEUX

- Effective date: 20040930

2006-05-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2005-09-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050930

2005-09-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050930

2005-03-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: S.A. *MAILLEUX

- Effective date: 20040930

2005-03-30 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20050110

2004-12-01 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

2004-11-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2218447 T3

2004-09-30 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040930

2004-09-30 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040930

2004-09-27 [LTIE] LT: INVALIDATION OF EUROPEAN PATENT OR PATENT EXTENSION

- Effective date: 20040407

2004-09-07 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040907

2004-08-09 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

2004-07-07 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040707

2004-06-16 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20040525

2004-05-19 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: FRENCH

2004-05-13 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 60102711 P 20040513

2004-04-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2004-04-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2004-04-07 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2004-04-07 [PG25 CY] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CY

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040407

2004-04-07 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040407

2004-04-07 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040407

2004-04-07 [PG25 TR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: TR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040407

2003-06-11 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030328

2003-06-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2003-06-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI