Global Patent Index - EP 1317586 A1

EP 1317586 A1 2003-06-11 - LAVATORY

Title (en)

LAVATORY

Title (de)

WASSERKLOSETT

Title (fr)

W.-C.

Publication

EP 1317586 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 01960057 A

Priority

  • CH 0100551 W
  • CH 17752000 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0222971A1] The lavatory comprises a lavatory body (2, 52) with an inlet (17) for flushing water and an outlet (18). Functional elements comprise at least one rinsing fountain (9, 62), a control device (12, 16), for the rinsing fountain (9, 62) and an operating device (46). The rinsing fountain (9, 62) is arranged in a chamber (30) in a rear section (4) of the lavatory body (2) comprising a channel (56) for the rinsing fountain (9, 62) on a flushing rim (2) and which is open for the installation and removal of the rinsing fountain (9). The rinsing fountain (62) is arranged outside the contaminated water zone, with an extending rinsing arm (6), in a hygienic clean and easily maintained manner. The rinsing fountain (9, 62) forms a unit with a drive mechanism (100) which may be installed in and removed from a chamber (30) in the lavatory body (2, 52). The drive mechanism (100) also forms a unit which may be installed or removed.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E03D 9/08

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E03D 1/26 (2006.01); E03D 9/08 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E03D 1/26 (2013.01); E03D 9/05 (2013.01); E03D 9/08 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Citation (third parties)

Third party :

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

DE 20112302 U1 20011011; AT 355421 T 20060315; AT 453764 T 20100115; AT 5466 U1 20020725; AU 8166601 A 20020326; CH 694468 A5 20050131; DE 50112129 D1 20070412; DE 50115290 D1 20100211; EP 1317586 A1 20030611; EP 1317586 B1 20070228; EP 1491692 A2 20041229; EP 1491692 A3 20050803; EP 1491692 B1 20120613; EP 1491693 A2 20041229; EP 1491693 A3 20050803; EP 1491693 B1 20091230; WO 0222971 A1 20020321

INPADOC legal status


2014-07-15 [REG AT MA03] REVOCATION OF THE PATENT

- Document: AT 355421 T

- Effective date: 20140109

2014-05-28 [REG DE R107] PUBLICATION OF GRANT OF EUROPEAN PATENT RESCINDED

- Document: DE 50112129

- Effective date: 20140528

2014-04-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF THE APPLICANT RENOUNCES

- Effective date: 20070228

2014-04-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF THE APPLICANT RENOUNCES

- Effective date: 20070228

2014-04-09 [27W] PATENT REVOKED

- Effective date: 20140109

2014-04-09 [GBPR] GB: PATENT REVOKED UNDER ART. 102 OF THE EP CONVENTION DESIGNATING THE UK AS CONTRACTING STATE

- Effective date: 20140109

2014-03-14 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2014-01-31 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20130919

- Year of fee payment: 13

2014-01-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20130918

- Year of fee payment: 13

2014-01-09 [REG DE R064] EPO'S REVOCATION DECISION NOW FINAL

- Document: DE 50112129

2014-01-09 [REG DE R103] PATENT REVOKED BY EPO

- Document: DE 50112129

2013-12-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20130926

- Year of fee payment: 13

2013-11-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20130920

- Year of fee payment: 13

2013-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20130924

- Year of fee payment: 13

2013-10-31 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20130919

- Year of fee payment: 13

2013-10-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20130920

- Year of fee payment: 13

2013-10-31 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20130923

- Year of fee payment: 13

2011-03-02 [R26] OPPOSITION FILED (CORRECTION)

- Opponent name: MAURER, PETER

- Effective date: 20071124

2011-03-02 [R26] OPPOSITION FILED (CORRECTION)

- Opponent name: TOTO LTD.

- Effective date: 20071126

2011-03-02 [R26] OPPOSITION FILED (CORRECTION)

- Opponent name: PAGETTE GMBH

- Effective date: 20071127

2010-11-03 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: GEBERIT INTERNATIONAL AG

2010-01-08 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

2009-11-02 [NLS] NL: ASSIGNMENTS OF EP-PATENTS

- Owner name: GEBERIT INTERNATIONAL AG

- Effective date: 20090811

2009-09-30 [PG25 TR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: TR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20070228

2009-09-09 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

- Free text: REGISTERED BETWEEN 20090813 AND 20090819

2009-08-31 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070912

2009-07-31 [PG25 CY] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CY

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20070228

2009-07-31 [REG CH PUE] ASSIGNMENT

- Owner name: GEBERIT INTERNATIONAL AG

- Free text: GEBERIT TECHNIK AG#SCHACHENSTRASSE 77#8645 JONA (CH) -TRANSFER TO- GEBERIT INTERNATIONAL AG#SCHACHENSTRASSE 77#8645 JONA (CH)

2008-11-14 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

2008-10-01 [NLS] NL: ASSIGNMENTS OF EP-PATENTS

- Owner name: GEBERIT TECHNIK AG

- Effective date: 20080717

2008-07-09 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

2008-06-25 [REG CH PUE] ASSIGNMENT

- Owner name: GEBERIT TECHNIK AG

- Free text: GEBERIT BALENA AG#SOORPARK#9606 BUETSCHWIL (CH) -TRANSFER TO- GEBERIT TECHNIK AG#SCHACHENSTRASSE 77#8645 JONA (CH)

2008-04-30 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070930

2008-04-30 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20070529

2008-03-03 [NLR1] NL: OPPOSITION HAS BEEN FILED WITH THE EPO

- Opponent name: MAURER, PETER

2008-03-03 [NLR1] NL: OPPOSITION HAS BEEN FILED WITH THE EPO

- Opponent name: TOTO LTD.

2008-03-03 [NLR1] NL: OPPOSITION HAS BEEN FILED WITH THE EPO

- Opponent name: PAGETTE GMBH

2008-01-09 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: MAURER, PETER

- Effective date: 20071124

2008-01-09 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: TOTO LTD.

- Effective date: 20071126

2008-01-09 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: PAGETTE GMBH

- Effective date: 20071127

2008-01-02 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: MAURER, PETER

- Effective date: 20071124

2008-01-02 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: TOTO LTD.

- Effective date: 20071126

2007-10-17 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

2007-09-28 [REG CH PCAR] CHANGE OF THE ADDRESS OF THE REPRESENTATIVE

- Free text: ISLER & PEDRAZZINI AG;POSTFACH 1772;8027 ZUERICH (CH)

2007-07-30 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20070730

2007-06-08 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20070608

2007-05-31 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20070531

2007-04-30 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: ISLER & PEDRAZZINI AG

2007-04-18 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: LANGUAGE OF EP DOCUMENT: GERMAN

2007-04-12 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50112129 P 20070412

2007-03-30 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2007-03-21 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20070228

2007-02-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2007-02-28 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2007-02-28 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20070228

2007-02-28 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20070228

2007-02-28 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20070228

2005-01-12 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: GEBERIT BALENA AG

2004-04-14 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20040224

2003-06-11 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020502

2003-06-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2003-06-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI