Global Patent Index - EP 1317595 A1

EP 1317595 A1 2003-06-11 - LOCKING SYSTEM FOR HOUSINGS

Title (en)

LOCKING SYSTEM FOR HOUSINGS

Title (de)

SCHLIESSSYSTEM FÜR GEHÄUSE

Title (fr)

SYSTEME DE FERMETURE POUR BOITIERS

Publication

EP 1317595 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 01982304 A

Priority

  • DE 20015976 U
  • EP 0110724 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0222998A1] The invention relates to a locking system for the door of a housing, comprising at least one locking catch which engages with a locking element arranged in the housing when the housing door is in a locked state. A security element for protecting the locking catch from being bent in the locked state is provided in the vicinity of said locking catch, at least on the side thereof facing away from the opening direction.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E05B 17/20; E05C 9/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E05B 17/00 (2006.01); E05B 17/20 (2006.01); E05C 9/18 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E05B 17/2088 (2013.01); E05B 17/0062 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0222998A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE GB

EPO simple patent family

DE 20015976 U1 20001130; AU 1392702 A 20020326; DE 50108191 D1 20051229; EP 1317595 A1 20030611; EP 1317595 B1 20051123; WO 0222998 A1 20020321

INPADOC legal status


2009-08-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090401

2008-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20071031

- Year of fee payment: 7

2007-11-24 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060917

2007-05-23 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20060917

2006-11-02 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20060824

2006-04-19 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20060327

2005-12-29 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50108191 P 20051229

2005-11-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE GB

2005-11-23 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2004-05-12 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION)

- Designated State(s): DE GB

2003-11-12 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030929

2003-08-13 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: RINKE, FRIEDRICHC/O QUANTE AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT

2003-08-13 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: SCHAUB, CORNELC/O QUANTE AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT

2003-08-13 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: WISTUBA, PATRICKC/O QUANTE AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT

2003-06-11 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030317

2003-06-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2003-06-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI