Global Patent Index - EP 1317596 A1

EP 1317596 A1 2003-06-11 - MOTOR VEHICLE DOORLOCK WITH COMBINED CENTRAL LOCKING AND OPENING ACTUATOR

Title (en)

MOTOR VEHICLE DOORLOCK WITH COMBINED CENTRAL LOCKING AND OPENING ACTUATOR

Title (de)

KRAFTFAHRZEUG-TÜRSCHLOSS MIT KOMBINIERTEM ZENTRALVERRIEGELUNGS- UND ÖFFNUNGSANTRIEB

Title (fr)

SERRURE DE PORTE D'AUTOMOBILE A MODE COMBINE DE CONDAMNATION ET D'OUVERTURE CENTRALISEES

Publication

EP 1317596 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 01974009 A

Priority

  • DE 0103397 W
  • DE 10044350 A
  • DE 10126290 A
  • DE 10139975 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0220925A1] The invention relates to a motor vehicle doorlock, which may be automatically locked and unlocked and opened both manually ad mechanically, whereby an external operating element (3), operable by hand, by means of an external door handle, can, when in a coupled position, operate a release element by means of a coupling element (5), or directly operate a locking element (8) and in an uncoupled position performs an idle movement. On non-operation of the external operating element (3), the coupling element (5) may be shifted from the coupled position to the uncoupled position and vice versa by a motor. A central locking actuator (12) is provided for the motor-driven operation of the coupling element (5), which in a second function can also operate the release element or the locking element (8). The invention is characterised in that an opening operation normally only occurs mechanically with the external operating element (3) and that the central locking actuator (12), in the second function, only operates the release element or the locking element (8) when the external operating element (3) is already in the idle movement.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E05B 63/00; E05B 65/12

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E05B 65/12 (2006.01); E05B 65/20 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E05B 81/06 (2013.01); E05B 81/14 (2013.01); E05B 81/16 (2013.01); E05B 81/90 (2013.01); E05B 85/01 (2013.01); Y10S 292/23 (2013.01); Y10T 292/1047 (2015.04); Y10T 292/1082 (2015.04)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0220925A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR IT

EPO simple patent family

WO 0220925 A1 20020314; DE 50111505 D1 20070104; EP 1317596 A1 20030611; EP 1317596 B1 20061122; US 2003116977 A1 20030626; US 6932393 B2 20050823

INPADOC legal status


2013-08-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120905

2013-08-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20121001

2013-08-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 50111505

- Effective date: 20130403

2013-07-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130403

2013-06-28 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20130531

2012-08-20 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 50111505

- Representative's name: GOTTSCHALD PATENTANWALTSKANZLEI, DE

2011-12-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20110915

- Year of fee payment: 11

2011-11-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20110922

- Year of fee payment: 11

2011-11-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20110930

- Year of fee payment: 11

2007-10-31 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20070823

2007-04-27 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2007-01-04 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50111505 P 20070104

2006-11-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR IT

2004-11-03 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20040917

2004-05-19 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION)

- Designated State(s): DE FR IT

2003-10-08 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: BROSE SCHLIESSSYSTEME GMBH & CO. KG

2003-06-11 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030407

2003-06-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR