Global Patent Index - EP 1317597 A1

EP 1317597 A1 2003-06-11 - CLOSING DEVICE FOR A VEHICLE

Title (en)

CLOSING DEVICE FOR A VEHICLE

Title (de)

SCHLIESSEINRICHTUNG FÜR EIN FAHRZEUG

Title (fr)

SYSTEME DE FERMETURE POUR UN VEHICULE

Publication

EP 1317597 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 01969273 A

Priority

  • DE 0103436 W
  • DE 10046188 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0222999A1] The invention relates to a closing device for a vehicle comprising a lock, a drive for determining the locking state of the locking device, by means of which the locking device may be placed in at least four different locking states and a rotating shaped disc on the drive, which may be rotated by the drive to determine the individual locking states, whereby the individual locking states are each assigned a particular angular position for the shaped disc. According to the invention, the shaped disc (1) is of such a form that said disc may be taken from each angular position, corresponding to one of the various states (V, K, S) and different to the unlocked state (E), without a third locking state occurring on performing the above.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E05B 65/20; E05B 47/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E05B 77/26 (2014.01); E05B 77/28 (2014.01); E05B 81/66 (2014.01); E05B 77/24 (2014.01); E05B 81/06 (2014.01); E05B 85/00 (2014.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E05B 77/26 (2013.01); E05B 77/28 (2013.01); E05B 81/66 (2013.01); E05B 77/245 (2013.01); E05B 81/06 (2013.01); E05B 85/01 (2013.01); Y10T 70/60 (2015.04); Y10T 70/65 (2015.04); Y10T 70/7062 (2015.04); Y10T 292/1082 (2015.04)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0222999A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 0222999 A1 20020321; DE 10046188 A1 20020418; DE 10046188 C2 20031030; EP 1317597 A1 20030611; EP 1317597 B1 20050323; ES 2238475 T3 20050901; US 2003196465 A1 20031023; US 6877348 B2 20050412

INPADOC legal status


2011-09-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090905

2011-07-29 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110704

2011-07-14 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20110714

2010-11-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090904

2010-07-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100401

2010-07-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090930

2010-06-25 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20100531

2010-05-26 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20090904

2009-02-27 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20081021

- Year of fee payment: 8

2009-01-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20080930

- Year of fee payment: 8

2008-12-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20080910

- Year of fee payment: 8

2008-11-28 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20080915

- Year of fee payment: 8

2008-01-31 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050623

2006-03-15 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20051227

2006-03-10 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2005-09-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2238475 T3

2005-06-15 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20050519

2005-04-28 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50105718 P 20050428

2005-04-20 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: GERMAN

2005-03-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT SE

2005-03-23 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2005-03-23 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050323

2005-03-23 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT SE

2004-05-26 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FR GB IT LI SE

2003-11-12 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030929

2003-06-11 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030319

2003-06-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR