Global Patent Index - EP 1317599 A1

EP 1317599 A1 2003-06-11 - A DAMPER MECHANISM

Title (en)

A DAMPER MECHANISM

Title (de)

DÄMPFERMECHANISMUS

Title (fr)

MECANISME AMORTISSEUR

Publication

EP 1317599 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 01970762 A

Priority

  • JP 2000275249 A
  • US 0128307 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0223001A1] A damper mechanism installed on an opening and closing device that has an arcuate plunger with the same radius of curvature of the cylinder it slidably mates with. A torsion coil spring causes the sliding action of the plunger into the cylinder in one direction.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E05F 5/10; E05F 1/12; E05F 3/10

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F16F 9/02 (2006.01); E05F 1/12 (2006.01); E05F 5/10 (2006.01); F16F 9/32 (2006.01); F16F 9/34 (2006.01); E05D 11/06 (2006.01); E05F 1/10 (2006.01); E05F 3/10 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E05F 5/10 (2013.01); E05F 1/1215 (2013.01); E05D 11/06 (2013.01); E05F 1/1016 (2013.01); E05F 3/108 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0223001A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

WO 0223001 A1 20020321; AU 9073401 A 20020326; CN 1250859 C 20060412; CN 1455841 A 20031112; DE 60111547 D1 20050721; DE 60111547 T2 20060511; EP 1317599 A1 20030611; EP 1317599 B1 20050615; HK 1060167 A1 20061124; JP 2002106623 A 20020410; JP 4633901 B2 20110223; KR 100767564 B1 20071017; KR 20030033052 A 20030426

INPADOC legal status


2014-08-29 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130930

2014-08-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140401

2014-08-29 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130910

2014-07-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130910

2014-07-03 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 60111547

- Effective date: 20140401

2014-06-27 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20140530

2014-05-28 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20130910

2012-12-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20120926

- Year of fee payment: 12

2012-12-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20120915

- Year of fee payment: 12

2012-12-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20120905

- Year of fee payment: 12

2012-10-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20120905

- Year of fee payment: 12

2006-06-07 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20060316

2006-04-14 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2005-07-21 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 60111547 P 20050721

2005-06-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2005-06-15 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2005-06-08 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION)

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2004-05-26 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION)

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE FR GB IT LI

2003-06-11 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030227

2003-06-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2003-06-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI