Global Patent Index - EP 1317601 A1

EP 1317601 A1 2003-06-11 - PLUG CONNECTOR FOR HOLLOW SECTIONS

Title (en)

PLUG CONNECTOR FOR HOLLOW SECTIONS

Title (de)

STECKVERBINDER FÜR HOHLPROFILE

Title (fr)

RACCORDS A EMBOITEMENT POUR PROFILES CREUX

Publication

EP 1317601 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 01974244 A

Priority

  • DE 20015913 U
  • EP 0110505 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0223004A1] The invention relates to a plug connector (1) for hollow sections (24) of spacer frames for insulating glass panes. Said plug connector comprises a plurality of lateral retainer elements (12, 13, 14) on the side wall, said retainer elements being arranged one after the other in the plug-in direction (9) of the hollow sections (24). At least some of said retainer elements are offset at a mutual distance (16, 17) transversely in relation to the plug-in direction. The retainer elements (12, 13, 14) are thus preferably arranged at various levels (h12, h13, h14), thereby engaging at various points on the hollow section (24).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E06B 3/667

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E06B 3/667 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E06B 3/667 (2013.01); Y10T 403/555 (2013.01); Y10T 403/559 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0223004A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

DE 20015913 U1 20020207; AT 272781 T 20040815; CA 2418863 A1 20030206; CA 2418863 C 20070320; CZ 20023779 A3 20030514; CZ 303219 B6 20120530; DK 1317601 T3 20041011; EP 1317601 A1 20030611; EP 1317601 B1 20040804; ES 2221653 T3 20050101; HK 1054069 A1 20050225; HU 0300463 A2 20030728; HU 224804 B1 20060228; PL 205223 B1 20100331; PL 358302 A1 20040809; PT 1317601 E 20041130; RU 2264520 C2 20051120; TR 200402353 T4 20041221; US 2004088943 A1 20040513; US 6862859 B2 20050308; WO 0223004 A1 20020321

INPADOC legal status


2018-02-28 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20171003

- Year of fee payment: 17

2017-11-30 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20170920

- Year of fee payment: 17

2017-11-30 [PGFP TR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: TR

- Payment date: 20170911

- Year of fee payment: 17

2017-11-30 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20170925

- Year of fee payment: 17

2017-11-30 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20170925

- Year of fee payment: 17

2017-11-30 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20170925

- Year of fee payment: 17

2017-11-30 [PGFP PT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Payment date: 20170829

- Year of fee payment: 17

2017-10-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20170926

- Year of fee payment: 17

2017-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20170829

- Year of fee payment: 17

2017-10-31 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Payment date: 20170920

- Year of fee payment: 17

2017-10-31 [PGFP GR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Payment date: 20170919

- Year of fee payment: 17

2017-10-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20170925

- Year of fee payment: 17

2017-10-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20170925

- Year of fee payment: 17

2017-10-31 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20170925

- Year of fee payment: 17

2017-09-25 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-09-22 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 16

2015-06-03 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: KRONENBERG, RALF M., DE

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: KRONENBERG, MAX, 42657 SOLINGEN, DE

- Document: DE 50103144

- Effective date: 20150429

2015-06-03 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 50103144

- Representative's name: ERNICKE & ERNICKE, DE

- Effective date: 20150429

2015-04-29 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 50103144

- Representative's name: ERNICKE & ERNICKE, DE

2007-10-30 [REG CH PFA] NAME/FIRM CHANGED

- Owner name: KRONENBERG, MAX

- Free text: KRONENBERG, MAX#BUENKENBERG 2#D-42657 SOLINGEN (DE) -TRANSFER TO- KRONENBERG, MAX#BUENKENBERG 2#D-42657 SOLINGEN (DE)

2005-07-27 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20050506

2005-05-27 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2005-03-23 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

2005-02-25 [REG HK GR] STANDARD PATENTS GRANTED IN HONG KONG

- Document: HK 1054069

2005-01-10 [REG SI IF] VALID ON THE PRS DATE

2005-01-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2221653 T3

2004-12-17 [REG GR EP] EP PATENT VALIDATED IN GREECE

- Document: GR 20040403747

2004-11-30 [REG PT SC4A] TRANSLATION IS AVAILABLE

- Free text: AVAILABILITY OF NATIONAL TRANSLATION

- Effective date: 20040916

2004-11-04 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20041104

2004-10-11 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

2004-09-30 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040930

2004-09-12 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040912

2004-09-09 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50103144 P 20040909

2004-09-08 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: GERMAN

2004-08-25 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20040804

2004-08-13 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2004-08-13 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: E. BLUM & CO. PATENTANWAELTE

2004-08-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2004-08-04 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: SI

2004-08-04 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2004-08-04 [PG25 CY] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CY

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040804

2004-08-04 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040804

2003-06-11 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20021018

2003-06-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2003-06-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: SI