Global Patent Index - EP 1317606 A1

EP 1317606 A1 2003-06-11 - TWO CYCLE ENGINE HAVING MINIMAL LUBRICATION

Title (en)

TWO CYCLE ENGINE HAVING MINIMAL LUBRICATION

Title (de)

ZWEITAKTMOTOR MIT MINIMALSCHMIERUNG

Title (fr)

MOTEUR A DEUX TEMPS A LUBRIFICATION MINIMALE

Publication

EP 1317606 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 01974251 A

Priority

  • DE 10045725 A
  • EP 0110602 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0223016A1] The invention relates to a two cycle engine (1) comprising a lean lubrication system, whereby the lubrication oil is only applied in the area of a contact surface between a piston (3) and a cylinder (2). An oil outlet (12) is provided in or below a running surface (11) pertaining to the cylinder (2) for this purpose. An oil aerosol can be applied alternately, according to the position of the piston (3), onto the running surface of a shaft (9) pertaining to the piston (3) and onto the running surface (11) of the cylinder (2) via said oil outlet.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F01M 1/08

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F01M 1/06 (2006.01); F01M 1/08 (2006.01); F01M 1/16 (2006.01); F01M 11/00 (2006.01); F02B 63/02 (2006.01); F02B 75/16 (2006.01); F02B 75/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F02B 63/02 (2013.01); F01M 1/08 (2013.01); F02B 75/16 (2013.01); F01M 2001/083 (2013.01); F02B 2075/025 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0223016A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE LI SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 0223016 A1 20020321; DE 10045725 A1 20020404; DE 10045725 B4 20050504; DE 50110278 D1 20060803; EP 1317606 A1 20030611; EP 1317606 B1 20060621; JP 2004509261 A 20040325; US 2004011308 A1 20040122; US 6932046 B2 20050823

INPADOC legal status


2017-07-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160930

2017-07-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20170401

2017-07-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160930

2017-05-02 [REG SE EUG] EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2017-04-28 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160914

2017-04-28 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2017-04-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 50110278

2015-11-30 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20150922

- Year of fee payment: 15

2015-10-30 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20150922

- Year of fee payment: 15

2015-10-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20150923

- Year of fee payment: 15

2012-05-16 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: WACKER NEUSON PRODUKTION GMBH & CO. KG, DE

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: WACKER NEUSON SE, 80809 MUENCHEN, DE

- Document: DE 50110278

- Effective date: 20120326

2012-05-16 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 50110278

- Representative's name: MUELLER HOFFMANN & PARTNER PATENTANWAELTE MBB, DE

- Effective date: 20120326

2012-03-26 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 50110278

- Representative's name: MUELLER - HOFFMANN & PARTNER PATENTANWAELTE, DE

2011-09-15 [REG CH PUE] ASSIGNMENT

- Owner name: WACKER NEUSON PRODUKTION GMBH & CO. KG

- Free text: WACKER NEUSON SE#PREUSSENSTRASSE 41#80809 MUENCHEN (DE) -TRANSFER TO- WACKER NEUSON PRODUKTION GMBH & CO. KG#PREUSSENSTRASSE 41#80809 MUENCHEN (DE)

2009-03-31 [REG CH PFA] NAME/FIRM CHANGED

- Owner name: WACKER NEUSON SE

- Free text: WACKER CONSTRUCTION EQUIPMENT AG#PREUSSENSTRASSE 41#80809 MUENCHEN (DE) -TRANSFER TO- WACKER NEUSON SE#PREUSSENSTRASSE 41#80809 MUENCHEN (DE)

2007-10-30 [REG CH PFA] NAME/FIRM CHANGED

- Owner name: WACKER CONSTRUCTION EQUIPMENT AG

- Free text: WACKER CONSTRUCTION EQUIPMENT AG#PREUSSENSTRASSE 41#80809 MUENCHEN (DE) -TRANSFER TO- WACKER CONSTRUCTION EQUIPMENT AG#PREUSSENSTRASSE 41#80809 MUENCHEN (DE)

2007-05-30 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20070322

2006-10-10 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2006-08-03 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50110278 P 20060803

2006-07-14 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: E. BLUM & CO. PATENTANWAELTE

2006-06-30 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2006-06-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): CH DE LI SE

2006-03-01 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION)

- Designated State(s): CH DE LI SE

2004-05-19 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION)

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE LI SE

2003-06-11 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030314

2003-06-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2003-06-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI