Global Patent Index - EP 1317609 A1

EP 1317609 A1 2003-06-11 - METHOD AND ELECTRONIC CONTROL UNIT FOR CONTROLLING THE REGENERATION OF A FUEL VAPOUR ACCUMULATOR IN INTERNAL COMBUSTION ENGINES

Title (en)

METHOD AND ELECTRONIC CONTROL UNIT FOR CONTROLLING THE REGENERATION OF A FUEL VAPOUR ACCUMULATOR IN INTERNAL COMBUSTION ENGINES

Title (de)

VERFAHREN UND ELEKTRONISCHE STEUEREINRICHTUNG ZUR STEUERUNG DER REGENERIERUNG EINES KRAFTSTOFFDAMPFZWISCHENSPEICHERS BEI VERBRENNUNGSMOTOREN

Title (fr)

PROCEDE ET DISPOSITIF DE COMMANDE ELECTRONIQUE SERVANT A COMMANDER LA REGENERATION D'UN RESERVOIR INTERMEDIAIRE A VAPEUR DE CARBURANT DANS DES MOTEURS THERMIQUES

Publication

EP 1317609 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 01971660 A

Priority

  • DE 0103292 W
  • DE 10043862 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0220960A1] The invention relates to a method for controlling a canister-purge valve between an internal combustion engine and a fuel vapour accumulator, whereby the stored fuel vapour is fed from the fuel vapour accumulator to the internal combustion engine, when the canister-purge valve is open. In said method, there are alternating phases of active and inactive tank ventilation and the purge rate in the active tank ventilation phase is predefined by purge rate default means, based on operating parameters of the motor and/or of the tank ventilation installation. If the length of the inactive tank ventilation phase exceeds a minimum duration, the purge rate in the subsequent active tank ventilation phase is temporarily restricted to a rate that is lower than that predefined by the purge rate default means.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F02D 35/00; F02M 25/08

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F02M 25/08 (2006.01); F02D 41/00 (2006.01); F02D 41/30 (2006.01); F02D 41/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F02D 41/3076 (2013.01); F02D 41/0032 (2013.01); F02D 41/023 (2013.01); F02D 41/3029 (2013.01); F02D 41/3064 (2013.01); F02D 41/0045 (2013.01); F02D 41/0275 (2013.01); Y10T 477/677 (2013.01); Y10T 477/68 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0220960A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR

EPO simple patent family

WO 0220960 A1 20020314; BR 0107170 A 20020618; CN 1388855 A 20030101; DE 10043862 A1 20020314; DE 50113514 D1 20080306; EP 1317609 A1 20030611; EP 1317609 B1 20080116; ES 2296801 T3 20080501; JP 2004508482 A 20040318; US 2003051716 A1 20030320; US 6755185 B2 20040629

INPADOC legal status


2018-05-25 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20180430

2018-03-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 50113514

2017-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20161027

- Year of fee payment: 16

2016-11-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20160825

- Year of fee payment: 16

2016-08-25 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 16

2013-07-31 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110901

2013-05-31 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20130531

2011-09-15 [REG DE R084] DECLARATION OF WILLINGNESS TO LICENCE

- Document: DE 50113514

- Effective date: 20110720

2011-07-27 [REG DE R084] DECLARATION OF WILLINGNESS TO LICENCE

- Document: DE 50113514

2010-10-29 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20100830

- Year of fee payment: 10

2008-12-24 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20081017

2008-08-29 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2008-05-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2296801 T3

2008-03-06 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50113514 P 20080306

2008-01-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR

2006-12-06 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20061107

2004-05-12 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION)

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR

2003-06-11 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030404

2003-06-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR