Global Patent Index - EP 1317611 A1

EP 1317611 A1 2003-06-11 - METHOD FOR GENERATING THE TIME-DELAY OF AN ELECTROMAGNETIC TANK BLEEDER VALVE

Title (en)

METHOD FOR GENERATING THE TIME-DELAY OF AN ELECTROMAGNETIC TANK BLEEDER VALVE

Title (de)

VERFAHREN ZUR BILDUNG DER VERZUGSZEIT EINES ELEKTROMAGNETISCHEN TANKENTLÜFTUNGSVENTILS

Title (fr)

PROCEDE PERMETTANT LA PRODUCTION DU TEMPS DE RETARD D'UNE SOUPAPE DE DEGAZAGE DE RESERVOIR ELECTROMAGNETIQUE

Publication

EP 1317611 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 01971684 A

Priority

  • DE 0103322 W
  • DE 10043698 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0220962A1] The invention relates to a method for the cyclically timed control of a flow control valve, whose opening diameter follows its control signal with a time-delay tv. According to said method, a value for the time-delay is taken into consideration during the generation of the control signal, whereby the intake manifold pressure is taken into account for the time-delay during the generation of the value.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F02D 35/00; F02M 25/08

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F02D 41/00 (2006.01); F02M 25/08 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F02M 25/08 (2013.01); F02D 41/004 (2013.01); F02D 2200/0406 (2013.01); F02D 2200/503 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0220962A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR IT

EPO simple patent family

WO 0220962 A1 20020314; DE 10043698 A1 20020314; DE 50110408 D1 20060817; EP 1317611 A1 20030611; EP 1317611 B1 20060705

INPADOC legal status


2018-07-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20180404

2018-04-04 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 50110408

2017-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20161125

- Year of fee payment: 16

2014-08-29 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130930

2014-08-29 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130903

2014-06-27 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20140530

2013-01-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20121008

- Year of fee payment: 12

2012-12-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20120926

- Year of fee payment: 12

2007-06-13 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20070410

2007-01-12 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2006-08-17 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50110408 P 20060817

2006-07-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR IT

2004-05-26 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION)

- Designated State(s): DE FR IT

2003-06-11 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030404

2003-06-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR