Global Patent Index - EP 1317615 A1

EP 1317615 A1 2003-06-11 - METHOD FOR DETERMINING A HOT-START SITUATION IN AN INTERNAL COMBUSTION ENGINE

Title (en)

METHOD FOR DETERMINING A HOT-START SITUATION IN AN INTERNAL COMBUSTION ENGINE

Title (de)

VERFAHREN ZUM BESTIMMEN EINER HEISSSTARTSITUATION BEI EINER BRENNKRAFTMASCHINE

Title (fr)

PROCEDE POUR DETERMINER UNE SITUATION DE DEMARRAGE A CHAUD DANS UN MOTEUR A COMBUSTION INTERNE

Publication

EP 1317615 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 01969227 A

Priority

  • DE 0103021 W
  • DE 10043695 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0220966A1] The invention relates to a method for determining a hot-start situation in an internal combustion engine of a motor vehicle. The invention also relates to a corresponding control device for an internal combustion engine, to a corresponding computer program with program code means, and to a corresponding computer program product with program code means.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F02D 41/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F02N 11/08 (2006.01); F02D 41/02 (2006.01); F02D 41/06 (2006.01); F02D 45/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F02D 41/065 (2013.01); F02D 2041/389 (2013.01); F02D 2200/0414 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0220966A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR IT

EPO simple patent family

WO 0220966 A1 20020314; BR 0114037 A 20030722; DE 10043695 A1 20020314; DE 50110169 D1 20060727; EP 1317615 A1 20030611; EP 1317615 B1 20060614; ES 2264987 T3 20070201; JP 2004508487 A 20040318; JP 5150031 B2 20130220; US 2004015288 A1 20040122; US 6874358 B2 20050405

INPADOC legal status


2018-03-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 50110169

2017-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20161027

- Year of fee payment: 16

2016-08-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150831

2016-06-03 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20160429

2016-04-29 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150807

2014-12-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20140827

- Year of fee payment: 14

2014-11-28 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20140819

- Year of fee payment: 14

2013-07-31 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110808

2013-05-30 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20130530

2010-10-29 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20100830

- Year of fee payment: 10

2007-05-23 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20070315

2007-02-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2264987 T3

2006-12-22 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2006-07-27 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50110169 P 20060727

2006-06-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR IT

2005-07-20 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20050606

2004-05-12 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION)

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR IT

2003-06-11 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030404

2003-06-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR