Global Patent Index - EP 1317624 A1

EP 1317624 A1 2003-06-11 - HYDRAULIC SYSTEM COMPRISING A MAIN PUMP AND A PRECOMPRESSION PUMP

Title (en)

HYDRAULIC SYSTEM COMPRISING A MAIN PUMP AND A PRECOMPRESSION PUMP

Title (de)

HYDRAULISCHES SYSTEM MIT EINER HAUPTPUMPE UND EINER VORDRUCKPUMPE

Title (fr)

SYSTEME HYDRAULIQUE COMPORTANT UNE POMPE PRINCIPALE ET UNE POMPE DE PRECOMPRESSION

Publication

EP 1317624 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 01956507 A

Priority

  • DE 10045118 A
  • EP 0107459 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0223041A1] The invention relates to a hydraulic system (1) comprising a main pump (12) and a precompression pump (5), whereby the outlet (8) of the precompression pump (5) is connected by a connecting line (9) to the inlet (11) of the main pump (12). The outlet (16) of the main pump (12) can be connected by a working line (17) to a consumer (A, B). The volume flow at the inlet (11) of the main pump (12) is changeable. The aim of the invention is to achieve greater efficiency. The precompression pump (5) comprises an adjusting device (6) for adjusting the flow rate.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F04B 23/10; F04B 23/04; F04C 11/00; F04C 15/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F04B 23/10 (2006.01); F04B 49/06 (2006.01); F04B 23/02 (2006.01); F04B 23/04 (2006.01); F04B 49/08 (2006.01); F04C 11/00 (2006.01); F04C 14/08 (2006.01); F04C 15/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F04C 14/08 (2013.01); F04B 23/04 (2013.01); F04B 23/106 (2013.01); F04B 49/08 (2013.01); F04C 11/005 (2013.01); F04B 2203/0209 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0223041A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 0223041 A1 20020321; DE 10045118 A1 20020328; DE 10045118 B4 20060209; DE 50113730 D1 20080424; EP 1317624 A1 20030611; EP 1317624 B1 20080312; JP 2004509269 A 20040325; JP 5016776 B2 20120905; US 2003185687 A1 20031002; US 6997685 B2 20060214

INPADOC legal status


2014-05-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130629

2014-05-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130701

2014-04-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130629

2014-04-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140101

2014-03-28 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20140228

2014-03-27 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 50113730

- Effective date: 20140101

2014-02-26 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20130629

2014-02-04 [REG SE EUG] EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2014-01-31 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130630

2012-12-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20120822

- Year of fee payment: 12

2012-09-28 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20120623

- Year of fee payment: 12

2012-08-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20120705

- Year of fee payment: 12

2012-08-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20120621

- Year of fee payment: 12

2012-08-31 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20120625

- Year of fee payment: 12

2009-02-18 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20081215

2008-12-12 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2008-07-01 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2008-04-24 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50113730 P 20080424

2008-04-02 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20080312

2008-03-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT SE

2008-03-12 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2008-01-02 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: F04B 23/10 20060101AFI20071126BHEP

2008-01-02 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: F04B 23/04 20060101ALI20071126BHEP

2008-01-02 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: F04C 15/00 20060101ALI20071126BHEP

2008-01-02 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: F04C 11/00 20060101ALI20071126BHEP

2007-05-02 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20070330

2004-05-26 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION)

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT SE

2003-09-17 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: LEMMEN, RALF

2003-06-11 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20021113

2003-06-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR