Global Patent Index - EP 1317626 A1

EP 1317626 A1 2003-06-11 - METHOD AND DEVICE FOR CONVEYING MEDIA

Title (en)

METHOD AND DEVICE FOR CONVEYING MEDIA

Title (de)

VERFAHREN UND MASCHINE ZUR FÖRDERUNG VON MEDIEN

Title (fr)

PROCEDE ET MACHINE POUR LE TRANSPORT DE SUBSTANCES

Publication

EP 1317626 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 01978142 A

Priority

  • DE 0103527 W
  • DE 10045866 A
  • DE 10054126 A
  • DE 10137798 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0223043A1] Disclosed is a method and a machine (displacement machine or similar) used to convey transportable media (gaseous, liquid, pasty or trickling). The drive produces a migrating wave.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F04B 43/12; F04B 43/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F04B 43/14 (2006.01); F04B 43/02 (2006.01); F04B 43/12 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F04B 43/02 (2013.01); F04B 43/021 (2013.01); F04B 43/023 (2013.01); F04B 43/028 (2013.01); F04B 43/123 (2013.01); F04B 43/14 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0223043A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

WO 0223043 A1 20020321; AT 335130 T 20060815; AU 1035902 A 20020326; BR 0113901 A 20040210; BR 0113901 B1 20110405; CA 2422579 A1 20030314; CA 2422579 C 20081118; CN 100494680 C 20090603; CN 1474912 A 20040211; DE 10146190 A1 20020425; DE 50110636 D1 20060914; EP 1317626 A1 20030611; EP 1317626 B1 20060802; ES 2269470 T3 20070401; HK 1062841 A1 20100219; IL 154779 A 20080320; IL 154779 D0 20031031; JP 2004509270 A 20040325; JP 5231706 B2 20130710; KR 100907118 B1 20090709; KR 20030051652 A 20030625; MX PA03002184 A 20030724

INPADOC legal status


2018-05-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20180322

- Year of fee payment: 17

2018-05-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20180222

- Year of fee payment: 17

2018-04-30 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20180227

- Year of fee payment: 17

2018-04-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20180301

- Year of fee payment: 17

2018-02-22 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 17

2018-01-15 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: QONQAVE GMBH, DE

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: BEENKER, JAN W., 70184 STUTTGART, DE

- Document: DE 50110636

2018-01-15 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 50110636

- Representative's name: PATENT- UND RECHTSANWALTSKANZLEI DAUB, DE

2017-10-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20170925

- Year of fee payment: 17

2017-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20170921

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-09-22 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 16

2015-07-01 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 50110636

- Representative's name: PATENT- UND RECHTSANWALTSKANZLEI DAUB, DE

2013-11-29 [PGFP TR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: TR

- Payment date: 20130912

- Year of fee payment: 13

2009-06-15 [REG CH AEN] MODIFICATION OF THE SCOPE OF THE PATENT

- Free text: DAS PATENT IST AUFGRUND DES WEITERBEHANDLUNGSANTRAGS VOM 29.05.2009 REAKTIVIERT WORDEN.

2009-04-30 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2008-11-28 [PG25 CY] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CY

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060802

2008-10-31 [PGRI CH] POSTGRANT: PATENT REINSTATED IN CONTRACTING STATE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Effective date: 20080709

2008-07-31 [REG CH AEN] MODIFICATION OF THE SCOPE OF THE PATENT

- Free text: DAS PATENT IST AUFGRUND DES WEITERBEHANDLUNGSANTRAGS VOM 01.07.2008 REAKTIVIERT WORDEN.

2008-07-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070930

2008-07-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070930

2008-07-31 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060914

2008-05-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2008-04-30 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20061103

2007-12-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: BEENKER, JAN, W.

- Effective date: 20060930

2007-11-24 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060914

2007-07-11 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20070503

2007-06-29 [REG CH AEN] MODIFICATION OF THE SCOPE OF THE PATENT

- Free text: DAS PATENT IST AUFGRUND DES WEITERBEHANDLUNGSANTRAGS VOM 01.06.2007 REAKTIVIERT WORDEN.

2007-05-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2007-04-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2269470 T3

2007-03-21 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

2007-03-09 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2007-01-02 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2007-01-02 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20070102

2006-11-29 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20061108

2006-11-02 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20061102

2006-11-02 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20061102

2006-09-30 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060930

2006-09-30 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060930

2006-09-14 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50110636 P 20060914

2006-09-06 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: LANGUAGE OF EP DOCUMENT: GERMAN

2006-08-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2006-08-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2006-08-02 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2006-08-02 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060802

2006-08-02 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060802

2006-08-02 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060802

2003-06-11 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030306

2003-06-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2003-06-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI