Global Patent Index - EP 1317696 A1

EP 1317696 A1 2003-06-11 - DEVICE FOR ACTIVATING AN ELECTRONIC CONTROL UNIT

Title (en)

DEVICE FOR ACTIVATING AN ELECTRONIC CONTROL UNIT

Title (de)

VORRICHTUNG ZUR AKTIVIERUNG EINES STEUERGERÄTS

Title (fr)

DISPOSITIF D'ACTIVATION D'UN APPAREIL DE COMMANDE

Publication

EP 1317696 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 01971669 A

Priority

  • DE 0103302 W
  • DE 10044087 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0221223A1] The invention relates to a device for activating an electronic control unit. Said device comprises at least one operational control (31 to 34), actuated by an operator, in addition to analogue coding elements (21 to 24) that are allocated to the operational control (31 to 34). In order to generate an activation signal for an electronic control unit (20), the device is provided with deactivation elements (41 to 44, 51 to 54) that deactivate at least one analogue coding element (21 to 24), to allow the digital coding of the operational element (31 to 34).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G05B 19/042

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H03M 11/24 (2006.01); G05B 19/042 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H03M 11/24 (2013.01); G05B 19/0425 (2013.01); G05B 2219/21006 (2013.01); G05B 2219/25117 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0221223A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB

EPO simple patent family

WO 0221223 A1 20020314; AU 9162301 A 20020322; DE 10044087 A1 20020404; EP 1317696 A1 20030611; US 2003015920 A1 20030123; US 7109892 B2 20060919

INPADOC legal status


2012-09-05 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20120301

2011-10-19 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: H03M 11/24 20060101AFI20110913BHEP

2011-10-19 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: G05B 19/042 20060101ALI20110913BHEP

2009-04-29 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20090324

2004-05-19 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION)

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB

2003-06-11 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030407

2003-06-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2003-06-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI