Global Patent Index - EP 1317700 A2

EP 1317700 A2 2003-06-11 - METHOD FOR AUTOMATICALLY PROTECTING DATA FROM BEING UNINTENTIONALLY OVERWRITTEN IN ELECTRONIC FORMS

Title (en)

METHOD FOR AUTOMATICALLY PROTECTING DATA FROM BEING UNINTENTIONALLY OVERWRITTEN IN ELECTRONIC FORMS

Title (de)

VERFAHREN ZUM AUTOMATISCHEN SCHUTZ VON DATEN GEGEN EIN UNBEABSICHTIGTES ÜBERSCHREIBEN IN ELEKTRONISCHEN FORMULAREN

Title (fr)

PROCEDE POUR PROTEGER AUTOMATIQUEMENT DES DONNEES CONTRE UN ECRASEMENT ACCIDENTEL DANS DES FORMULAIRES ELECTRONIQUES

Publication

EP 1317700 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 01967043 A

Priority

  • EP 01967043 A
  • DE 0103327 W
  • EP 00119576 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1187035A1] The method involves reading (A) in the data (10), automatically identifying (B) the data (12) to be protected and protecting (C) the identified and/or to be protected data using a safety mechanism against unintentional access. The process can be selectively activated and/or deactivated within the program for individual classes of data.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G06F 1/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G06F 1/00 (2006.01); G06F 17/24 (2006.01); G06F 21/62 (2013.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G06F 21/6227 (2013.01); G06F 17/243 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0221240A3

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT CH DE GB IE LI

EPO simple patent family

EP 1187035 A1 20020313; CA 2403355 A1 20020314; CN 1423784 A 20030611; EP 1317700 A2 20030611; US 2003159108 A1 20030821; WO 0221240 A2 20020314; WO 0221240 A3 20020606

INPADOC legal status


2009-08-26 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20090303

2007-12-12 [RAP3] CORRECTION OF THE ADDRESS OR NAME OF APPLICANT

- Owner name: NOKIA SIEMENS NETWORKS GMBH & CO. KG

2007-11-14 [RAP3] CORRECTION OF THE ADDRESS OR NAME OF APPLICANT

- Owner name: NOKIA SIEMENS NETWORKS S.P.A.

2007-09-19 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: NOKIA SIEMENS NETWORKS GMBH & CO. KG

2004-05-19 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION)

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE GB IE LI

2003-06-11 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020821

2003-06-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR