Global Patent Index - EP 1317703 A1

EP 1317703 A1 2003-06-11 - DISPLAY KEYBOARD

Title (en)

DISPLAY KEYBOARD

Title (de)

ANZEIGTASTATUR

Title (fr)

CLAVIER AFFICHEUR

Publication

EP 1317703 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 00917178 A

Priority

FR 0000915 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0177802A1] The invention concerns a keyboard with keys (K) and a microprocessor ( mu P) comprising a storage connected thereto, at least some keys being each equipped with integrated illuminating means. The invention is characterised in that the integrated illuminating means is adapted to constitute display means for the microprocessor ( mu P).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G06F 3/023; G06F 3/02; H03M 11/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G06F 3/02 (2006.01); G06F 3/023 (2006.01); H03M 11/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G06F 3/0238 (2013.01); G06F 3/0202 (2013.01); H03M 11/02 (2013.01); H01H 2219/039 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0177802A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

WO 0177802 A1 20011018; AU 3827300 A 20011023; EP 1317703 A1 20030611

INPADOC legal status


2005-11-02 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20050507

2004-12-22 [19W] RESUMPTION OF PROCEEDINGS BEFORE GRANT (AFTER INTERRUPTION OF PROCEEDINGS)

- Effective date: 20041026

2004-11-03 [19U] INTERRUPTION OF PROCEEDINGS BEFORE GRANT

- Effective date: 20040820

2004-05-26 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION)

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2003-06-11 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030305

2003-06-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE