Global Patent Index - EP 1317705 A1

EP 1317705 A1 2003-06-11 - ELECTRONIC RECORDING AND COMMUNICATION OF INFORMATION

Title (en)

ELECTRONIC RECORDING AND COMMUNICATION OF INFORMATION

Title (de)

ELEKTRONISCHES AUFZEICHNEN UND ÜBERMITTELN VON INFORMATIONEN

Title (fr)

ENREGISTREMENT ELECTRONIQUE ET COMMUNICATION D'INFORMATIONS

Publication

EP 1317705 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 01944047 A

Priority

  • SE 0101433 W
  • SE 0003195 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0221252A1] In a method of recording and managing information, information is written on a product using a handheld writing device, the handwritten information being recorded electronically and at least partly communicated in a communication network. Moreover, the user writes by means of the writing device a command which is recorded electronically and which qualifies the managing of the electronically recorded information in the communication network. A system for information management, a server unit in such a system, a computer program for information management and a product are also described.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G06F 3/03; G06K 11/18; G06K 19/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B42D 15/02 (2006.01); B43K 29/00 (2006.01); G06F 3/03 (2006.01); G06F 3/0354 (2013.01); G06F 3/041 (2006.01); G06F 3/0488 (2013.01); G06F 15/00 (2006.01); G06F 15/02 (2006.01); G06K 9/62 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G06F 3/03545 (2013.01); G06F 3/0321 (2013.01); G06F 3/04886 (2013.01)

Citation (third parties)

Third party :

  • US 5661506 A 19970826 - LAZZOUNI MOHAMED [US], et al
  • US 5852434 A 19981222 - SEKENDUR ORAL F [US]
  • DYMETMAN M; COPPERMAN M: "Intelligent paper", LECTURE NOTES IN COMPUTER SCIENCE, vol. 1375, March 1998 (1998-03-01), pages 392 - 406, XP002328425
  • See also references of WO 0221252A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

WO 0221252 A1 20020314; AT 414297 T 20081115; AU 6649201 A 20020322; AU 8635501 A 20020322; DE 60136570 D1 20081224; EP 1317705 A1 20030611; EP 1382006 A1 20040121; EP 1382006 B1 20081112; JP 2004508228 A 20040318; JP 2004508632 A 20040318; SE 0003195 D0 20000907; SE 0003195 L 20020308; SE 519820 C2 20030415; WO 0221431 A1 20020314

INPADOC legal status


2012-02-22 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20110830

2011-05-18 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20110419

2009-10-28 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: ANOTO AB

2006-06-07 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: ANOTO AB

2005-08-03 [111L] LICENCES

- Free text: 0100 LEAPFROG ENTERPRISES INC.

- Effective date: 20050530

2005-03-23 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: ANOTO IP LIC HB

2003-06-11 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030407

2003-06-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2003-06-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI