Global Patent Index - EP 1317720 A2

EP 1317720 A2 2003-06-11 - PHOTO-SERVER COMMUNICATION PROTOCOLS ON A FTP-LIKE ACCESS NETWORK IN A DIGITAL CAMERA DEVICE

Title (en)

PHOTO-SERVER COMMUNICATION PROTOCOLS ON A FTP-LIKE ACCESS NETWORK IN A DIGITAL CAMERA DEVICE

Title (de)

BILDERSERVERÜBERTRAGUNGSPROTOLLE ÜBER EIN FTP-ÄHNLICHES ZUGRIFFSNETZWERK IN EINEM DIGITALEN KAMERAGERÄT

Title (fr)

PROTOCOLES DE COMMUNICATION DE SERVICE PHOTO ET METHODOLOGIE DESTINEE A FOURNIR A DES DISPOSITIFS HOTES DISPARATES UN ACCES DE TYPE FTP A DES IMAGES NUMERIQUES STOCKEES SUR UNE CAMERA NUMERIQUE

Publication

EP 1317720 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 01989072 A

Priority

  • US 0140216 W
  • US 66053100 A
  • US 70341200 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO02056202A2] A methodology for providing FTP-like server capability to a portable, intermittently-connected device, such as a digital camera device, is described. Using XML syntax, a photo-serving protocols suite supporting FTP-like photo-serving capability is incorporated into a digital camera device (or other portable device), so that digital images (or other files) on that device may be easily accessed by a variety of disparate hosts over standard protocols. If desired, standard (e.g., generic) FTP may be employed instead of the photo-serving protocols. All hosts that are commonly available include implementations of industry-standard TCP/IP protocols on which the photo-serving protocols may be borne. As a result, no host need have a proprietary, one-off solution to bear the photo-serving protocols. The camera device, at the level of the photo-serving protocols, functions in an identical manner no matter what host the camera device is attached to, and no matter how an individual industry-standard protocol suite is borne or implemented. In this fashion, a variety of host devices can access digital photos (or other files or objects) on the camera device with the same ease that a desktop computer may access files from an FTP server, for purposes of receiving or manipulating photographic image information captured on the digital camera device.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G06F 17/30

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G06F 9/445 (2006.01); H04N 1/21 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G06F 9/4411 (2013.01); H04N 1/2179 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 02056202A3

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

WO 02056202 A2 20020718; WO 02056202 A3 20030320; WO 02056202 A8 20021024; AU 2002243194 A1 20020724; EP 1317720 A2 20030611

INPADOC legal status


2011-05-11 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20101117

2010-08-04 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20100706

2010-01-13 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: VERISIGN ICX CORPORATION

2003-09-17 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030724

2003-06-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2003-06-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI