Global Patent Index - EP 1317728 A1

EP 1317728 A1 2003-06-11 - METHOD AND DEVICE FOR CARRYING OUT AN ELECTRONIC AUCTION IN A COMMUNICATIONS NETWORK

Title (en)

METHOD AND DEVICE FOR CARRYING OUT AN ELECTRONIC AUCTION IN A COMMUNICATIONS NETWORK

Title (de)

VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUM DURCHFÜHREN EINER ELEKTRONISCHEN AUKTION IN EINEM KOMMUNIKATIONSNETZ

Title (fr)

PROCEDE ET DISPOSITIF PERMETTANT DE REALISER UNE VENTE AUX ENCHERES ELECTRONIQUE DANS UN RESEAU DE COMMUNICATION

Publication

EP 1317728 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 01982220 A

Priority

  • DE 10043860 A
  • EP 0109898 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: US2004039680A1] A method is described for carrying out a reverse electronic online auction between a number of bidders and one buyer for the procurement of a product needed by the buyer, over a communications network, having the following steps: selecting a limited number of bidders based on a specified request for bid by the buyer, notifying the bidders concerning the point in time, the duration of the auction and the online auction room of the auction, carrying out the auction at the time period stated, each bidder being able to make his bids during the permissible time period, each bidder has indicated to him the most favorable bid of the competitors in anonymous form and the remaining auction time, and calculating a comparison quantity overall costs as a function of the particular price and of further suitable criteria, for comparing the bids of the individual bidders online for each bid, the auction being extended by at least one predetermined time period.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G06F 17/60

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G06Q 30/00 (2012.01); H04L 12/16 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G06Q 30/08 (2013.01); G06Q 40/04 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

WO 0221353 A2 20020314; DE 10043860 A1 20020418; EP 1317728 A1 20030611; JP 2004508637 A 20040318; US 2004039680 A1 20040226

INPADOC legal status


2012-10-10 [18R] REFUSED

- Effective date: 20120724

2012-07-24 [REG DE R003] REFUSAL DECISION NOW FINAL

2012-07-11 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: VOLKSWAGEN AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT

2006-10-11 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20060908

2004-05-12 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION)

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2003-08-06 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: HORCH, MARKUS

2003-08-06 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: HANSEN, MEIKE

2003-06-11 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030404

2003-06-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR