Global Patent Index - EP 1317747 A2

EP 1317747 A2 2003-06-11 - LICENSE PLATE

Title (en)

LICENSE PLATE

Title (de)

KENNZEICHENSCHILD

Title (fr)

PLAQUE D'IMMATRICULATION

Publication

EP 1317747 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 01971872 A

Priority

  • DE 10044882 A
  • EP 0109046 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: US2003090797A1] The present invention relates to a license plate, which has an upper side that is facing an observer in a mounted state, a lower side that faces away from an observer in a mounted state, and a luminous sheet (18), the luminous sheet (18) being provided with reflecting means (20), either directly, or using at least one further layer.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G09F 13/22; B60R 13/10; G09F 13/16

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B60Q 1/56 (2006.01); B60R 13/10 (2006.01); G09F 13/16 (2006.01); G09F 13/22 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B60R 13/105 (2013.01); B60R 13/10 (2013.01); G09F 13/16 (2013.01); G09F 13/22 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0223509A3

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

US 2003090797 A1 20030515; CN 1180387 C 20041215; CN 1436343 A 20030813; DE 10044882 A1 20020321; EP 1317747 A2 20030611; JP 2004509010 A 20040325; WO 0223509 A2 20020321; WO 0223509 A3 20020829

INPADOC legal status


2012-04-11 [R18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN (CORRECTION)

- Effective date: 20110510

2011-11-02 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20110408

2005-03-30 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20050215

2004-05-26 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION)

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2003-06-11 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030414

2003-06-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR