Global Patent Index - EP 1317758 A1

EP 1317758 A1 2003-06-11 - HALF-CYCLE TRANSDUCTOR WITH A MAGNETIC CORE, USE OF HALF-CYCLE TRANSDUCTORS AND METHOD FOR PRODUCING MAGNETIC CORES FOR HALF-CYCLE TRANSDUCTORS

Title (en)

HALF-CYCLE TRANSDUCTOR WITH A MAGNETIC CORE, USE OF HALF-CYCLE TRANSDUCTORS AND METHOD FOR PRODUCING MAGNETIC CORES FOR HALF-CYCLE TRANSDUCTORS

Title (de)

TRANSDUKTORDROSSEL MIT MAGNETKERN, VERWENDUNG VON TRANSDUKTORDROSSELN SOWIE VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON MAGNETKERNEN FÜR TRANSDUKTORDROSSELN

Title (fr)

TRANSDUCTEUR MAGNETIQUE A DEMI-PERIODE AVEC NOYAU MAGNETIQUE, UTILISATION DE TRANSDUCTEURS MAGNETIQUES A DEMI-PERIODE, AINSI QUE PROCEDE DE FABRICATION DE NOYAUX MAGNETIQUES POUR TRANSDUCTEURS MAGNETIQUES A DEMI-PERIODE

Publication

EP 1317758 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 01978352 A

Priority

  • DE 10045705 A
  • EP 0110362 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0223560A1] The invention relates to a transductor regulator with a magnetic core which is made up of a nanocrystalline alloy which is almost free of magnetorestriction. The core has as low cyclic magnetization losses as possible and as rectangular a hysterisis cycle as possible. Said alloy has the composition: FeaCobCucM'dSixByM''z, M' representing an element from the group V, Nb, Ta, Ti, Mo, W, Zr, Hf or a combination of these and M'' representing an element from the group C, P, Ge, As, Sb, In, O, N or a combination of these and the following conditions applying: a + b + c + d + x + y + z = 100 %, with a = 100 % - b -c - d - x - y - z, 0 </= b </= 15, 0,5 </= c </= 2, 0,1 </= d </= 6, 2 </= x </= 20, 2 </= y </= 18, 0 </= z </= 10 and x + y > 18. The inventive transductor regulators are particularly advantageously used in motor vehicle voltage supplies, rail power supplies or in aircraft power supplies.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01F 27/25; H01F 1/153; H01F 37/00; H01F 41/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C21D 6/00 (2006.01); C22C 38/00 (2006.01); H01F 1/14 (2006.01); H01F 1/153 (2006.01); H01F 41/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01F 1/15308 (2013.01); H01F 1/15333 (2013.01); H01F 41/0226 (2013.01); Y10T 29/4902 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0223560A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

WO 0223560 A1 20020321; CN 1258779 C 20060607; CN 1475018 A 20040211; DE 10045705 A1 20020404; DE 50115446 D1 20100602; EP 1317758 A1 20030611; EP 1317758 B1 20100421; JP 2004509459 A 20040325; US 2004027220 A1 20040212; US 7442263 B2 20081028

INPADOC legal status


2018-08-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20171002

2018-07-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20170907

2018-06-29 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20180531

2018-05-23 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20170907

2018-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20171130

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-11-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20160928

- Year of fee payment: 16

2016-10-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20160930

- Year of fee payment: 16

2016-09-28 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 16

2011-03-30 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20110124

2010-06-02 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50115446 P 20100602

2010-04-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2010-04-21 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2009-12-02 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION)

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2008-06-25 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: ISLER AND PEDRAZZINI AG

2004-05-12 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION)

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE FR GB LI

2003-06-11 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030228

2003-06-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR