Global Patent Index - EP 1317771 A1

EP 1317771 A1 2003-06-11 - IMPROVED SEMICONDUCTOR STRUCTURE AND METHOD OF FABRICATION

Title (en)

IMPROVED SEMICONDUCTOR STRUCTURE AND METHOD OF FABRICATION

Title (de)

VERBESSERTE HALBLEITERVORRICHTUNG UND HERSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN

Title (fr)

STRUCTURE SEMI-CONDUCTRICE AMELIOREE ET PROCEDE DE FABRICATION

Publication

EP 1317771 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 01968153 A

Priority

  • US 0126645 W
  • US 66269100 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0223626A1] High aspect ratio vias formed in a first insulating layer (34) covering a semiconductor substrate are filled with conductors in a manner: sidewalls and botton of each via are coated with a composite layer (44,46,48) of titanium nitride, and a CVD seed layer of aluminium. A first PVD aluminium layer is then formed while the semiconductor body is heated to about 400 degrees Cso that it fills the vias (38) and forms a first overlying blanket layer (50). A second PVD blanket layer of aluminium (55) is then formed at about 200 degrees C. Both aluminium layers are patterned and etched to result incolumns of aluminium around which a second insulating layer (62) is then formed. The ends of the columns of aluminium at a top of the second insulating layerlie in common plane to which steppers can relatively easily align patterns.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01L 21/768; H01L 23/522

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01L 21/3205 (2006.01); H01L 21/768 (2006.01); H01L 23/522 (2006.01); H01L 23/532 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01L 21/76843 (2013.01); H01L 21/32051 (2013.01); H01L 21/7684 (2013.01); H01L 21/76876 (2013.01); H01L 21/76885 (2013.01); H01L 23/5226 (2013.01); H01L 23/5329 (2013.01); H01L 2924/0002 (2013.01)

Combination set (CPC)

H01L 2924/0002 + H01L 2924/00

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0223626A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE FR GB IE IT LI

EPO simple patent family

WO 0223626 A1 20020321; DE 60142481 D1 20100812; EP 1317771 A1 20030611; EP 1317771 B1 20100630; KR 20030040460 A 20030522; US 6373135 B1 20020416

INPADOC legal status


2018-05-25 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20180430

2017-07-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160824

2017-07-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20170301

2017-04-26 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20160824

2017-03-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 60142481

2016-11-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20160712

- Year of fee payment: 16

2016-07-12 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 16

2016-01-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20150929

- Year of fee payment: 15

2015-11-13 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

- Owner name: INFINEON TECHNOLOGIES AG, DE

- Effective date: 20151013

2015-10-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20150923

- Year of fee payment: 15

2015-10-12 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: POLARIS INNOVATIONS LTD., IE

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: INFINEON TECHNOLOGIES AG, 85579 NEUBIBERG, DE

- Document: DE 60142481

2015-10-08 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 15

2015-09-23 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

- Free text: REGISTERED BETWEEN 20150827 AND 20150902

2015-06-05 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: INFINEON TECHNOLOGIES AG, DE

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: QIMONDA AG, 81739 MUENCHEN, DE

- Document: DE 60142481

2015-06-05 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: POLARIS INNOVATIONS LTD., IE

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: QIMONDA AG, 81739 MUENCHEN, DE

- Document: DE 60142481

2012-07-31 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110824

2012-05-23 [REG IE MM4A] PATENT LAPSED

2012-02-15 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

- Free text: REGISTERED BETWEEN 20120119 AND 20120125

2012-02-02 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: QIMONDA AG, DE

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: INTERUNIVERSITAIR MICROELEKTRON, QIMONDA AG, , BE

- Document: DE 60142481

- Effective date: 20111222

2012-02-02 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: QIMONDA AG, DE

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: INFINEON TECHNOLOGIES NORTH AMERICA CORP., SAN JOSE, CALIF., US

- Document: DE 60142481

- Effective date: 20111208

2012-02-02 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: INFINEON TECHNOLOGIES AG, DE

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: INFINEON TECHNOLOGIES NORTH AMERICA CORP., SAN JOSE, CALIF., US

- Document: DE 60142481

- Effective date: 20111208

2012-02-02 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: INFINEON TECHNOLOGIES AG, DE

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: INTERUNIVERSITAIR MICROELEKTRON, QIMONDA AG, , BE

- Document: DE 60142481

- Effective date: 20111222

2012-02-02 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: INFINEON TECHNOLOGIES AG, DE

- Free text: FORMER OWNERS: INTERUNIVERSITAIR MICROELEKTRONICA CENTRUM (IMEC), LEUVEN, BE; QIMONDA AG, 81739 MUENCHEN, DE

- Document: DE 60142481

- Effective date: 20111222

2012-02-02 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: POLARIS INNOVATIONS LTD., IE

- Free text: FORMER OWNERS: INTERUNIVERSITAIR MICROELEKTRONICA CENTRUM (IMEC), LEUVEN, BE; QIMONDA AG, 81739 MUENCHEN, DE

- Document: DE 60142481

- Effective date: 20111222

2012-02-02 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: POLARIS INNOVATIONS LTD., IE

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: INFINEON TECHNOLOGIES NORTH AMERICA CORP., SAN JOSE, CALIF., US

- Document: DE 60142481

- Effective date: 20111208

2011-12-08 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 60142481

2011-07-21 [REG DE R097] NO OPPOSITION FILED AGAINST GRANTED PATENT, OR EPO OPPOSITION PROCEEDINGS CONCLUDED WITHOUT DECISION

- Document: DE 60142481

- Effective date: 20110330

2011-06-08 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20110331

2011-03-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20100630

2010-10-29 [PGFP IE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Payment date: 20100820

- Year of fee payment: 10

2010-08-12 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 60142481 P 20100812

2010-07-21 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

2010-06-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IE IT

2010-06-30 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2008-02-20 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20080117

2004-05-19 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION)

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE FR GB IE IT LI

2003-06-11 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030314

2003-06-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR