Global Patent Index - EP 1317779 A2

EP 1317779 A2 2003-06-11 - THERMOELECTRICAL COMPONENT AND METHOD FOR PRODUCTION THEREOF AND METHOD AND DEVICE FOR THE PRODUCTION OF SAID THERMOELECTRIC COMPONENT

Title (en)

THERMOELECTRICAL COMPONENT AND METHOD FOR PRODUCTION THEREOF AND METHOD AND DEVICE FOR THE PRODUCTION OF SAID THERMOELECTRIC COMPONENT

Title (de)

THERMOELEKTRISCHES BAUELEMENT UND VERFAHREN ZU SEINER HERSTELLUNG

Title (fr)

COMPOSANT THERMOELECTRIQUE ET PROCEDE POUR SA FABRICATION, PROCEDE ET DISPOSITIF POUR LA SEPARATION ET LE TRANSFERT DE MATERIAUX EN COUCHE POUR LA FABRICATION DUDIT COMPOSANT THERMOELECTRIQUE

Publication

EP 1317779 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 01965221 A

Priority

  • DE 10045419 A
  • EP 0109861 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0223642A2] The invention relates to devices for the production of a thermoelectric component, which is of such a form, in terms of the power characteristics of conventional thermogenerators, as to be particularly suitable for low powers and relatively high voltages and economically producible. According to the invention, at least two electrically coupled semiconductor components or a semiconductor component and a metal layer are connected on an insulating substrate, whereby the substrate is a flexible film element. The invention further relates to a method for production of such a thermoelectric component.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01L 35/08

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01L 35/32 (2006.01); H01L 35/34 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01L 35/34 (2013.01); H01L 35/32 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0223642A3

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

WO 0223642 A2 20020321; WO 0223642 A3 20030130; CA 2422471 A1 20030314; DE 10045419 A1 20020404; DE 10045419 B4 20071220; EP 1317779 A2 20030611; US 2004075167 A1 20040422

INPADOC legal status


2008-09-17 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20080326

2007-01-17 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: FRAUNHOFER-GESELLSCHAFT ZUR FOERDERUNG DER ANGEWAN

2003-11-19 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: FRAUNHOFER-GESELLSCHAFT ZUR FOERDERUNG DERANGEWAND

2003-07-16 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: FRAUNHOFER-GESELLSCHAFT ZURFOERDERUNG DER ANGEWAND

2003-06-11 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030404

2003-06-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2003-06-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI