Global Patent Index - EP 1317807 A2

EP 1317807 A2 2003-06-11 - SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR PROCESSING AUDIO DATA

Title (en)

SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR PROCESSING AUDIO DATA

Title (de)

SYSTEM UND VERFAHREN FÜR DIE BEARBEITUNG VON AUDIODATEN

Title (fr)

SYSTEME ET PROCEDE POUR TRAITER DES DONNEES AUDIO

Publication

EP 1317807 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 01966644 A

Priority

  • US 0128088 W
  • US 23145000 P
  • US 23140900 P
  • US 23107600 P
  • US 23140800 P
  • US 23108100 P

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0221505A2] A system for processing audio data is provided. The system includes a spectral shaping system that receives sample audio data and adaptive gain dat and generates spectral characteristic data for one or more spectral bands. The system also includes an audio processing system that receives the spectral characteristic data and which processes the audio data so as to provide the spectral characteristic data for the spectral bands of the audio data.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H04H 1/00; H04H 5/00; G10L 19/14; G10L 21/02; H03G 5/02; H03G 5/16

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G10L 21/00 (2013.01); G11B 20/10 (2006.01); G11B 27/031 (2006.01); G10L 21/013 (2013.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H04H 60/04 (2013.01); G10L 21/00 (2013.01); G11B 20/10527 (2013.01); G11B 27/031 (2013.01); G10L 2021/0135 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

WO 0221505 A2 20020314; WO 0221505 A3 20030313; AU 8714001 A 20020322; EP 1317807 A2 20030611

INPADOC legal status


2018-05-02 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: DTS, INC.

2018-05-02 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: REAMS, ROBERT W.

2018-04-11 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: REAMS, ROBERT W.

2018-04-11 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: REAMS, ROBERT W.

2009-04-29 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20090331

2009-01-28 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: REAMS, ROBERT, W.

2003-06-11 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030408

2003-06-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2003-06-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI