Global Patent Index - EP 1317809 A1

EP 1317809 A1 2003-06-11 - METHOD AND SYSTEM FOR STEGANOGRAPHICALLY EMBEDDING INFORMATION BITS IN SOURCE SIGNALS

Title (en)

METHOD AND SYSTEM FOR STEGANOGRAPHICALLY EMBEDDING INFORMATION BITS IN SOURCE SIGNALS

Title (de)

VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR STEGANOGRAPHISCHEN EINBETTUNG EINER INFORMATION IN QUELLENSIGNALEN

Title (fr)

PROCEDE ET SYSTEME D'INTEGRATION STEGANOGRAPHIQUE DE BITS D'INFORMATION DANS DES SIGNAUX SOURCES

Publication

EP 1317809 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 01956130 A

Priority

  • US 0124468 W
  • US 63450600 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0213436A1] A method and system for embedding (E) information bits in a source signal (A) like images, audio or video. The embedding being performed optimally for a given worst-case scenario of unintentional or intentional attack of the host signal (to remove the embedded bits), and a given distortion of the host signal due to information embedding.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H04K 1/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H04N 1/387 (2006.01); G06T 1/00 (2006.01); G09C 5/00 (2006.01); H04L 9/06 (2006.01); H04N 1/32 (2006.01); H04N 7/26 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G06T 1/005 (2013.01); H04N 1/32144 (2013.01); H04N 1/32154 (2013.01); H04N 1/3232 (2013.01); H04N 19/467 (2014.11); H04N 21/23892 (2013.01); H04N 21/8358 (2013.01); G06T 2201/0065 (2013.01); G06T 2201/0083 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

WO 0213436 A1 20020214; AU 7816301 A 20020218; EP 1317809 A1 20030611; EP 1317809 A4 20050518; JP 2004506379 A 20040226

INPADOC legal status


2010-03-19 [REG HK WD] APPLICATIONS WITHDRAWN, DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN, OR REFUSED AFTER PUBLICATION IN HONG KONG

- Document: HK 1057138

2008-08-20 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20080226

2005-05-18 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20050401

2003-07-30 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: RAMKUMAR, MAHALINGAM

2003-07-30 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: AKANSU, ALI, N.

2003-06-11 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030310

2003-06-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2003-06-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI