Global Patent Index - EP 1317838 A1

EP 1317838 A1 2003-06-11 - METHOD FOR CHECKING THE COMPLIANCE OF A BLUETOOTH DEVICE FOR TESTING

Title (en)

METHOD FOR CHECKING THE COMPLIANCE OF A BLUETOOTH DEVICE FOR TESTING

Title (de)

VERFAHREN ZUM ÜBERPRÜFEN DER COMPLIANCE EINES ZU TESTENDEN BLUETOOTH-GERÄTES

Title (fr)

PROCEDE POUR CONTROLER LA CONFORMITE D'UN APPAREIL BLUETOOTH DEVANT ETRE TESTE

Publication

EP 1317838 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 01967057 A

Priority

  • DE 0103342 W
  • DE 10045243 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0223858A1] The invention relates to a method for checking the compliance of a bluetooth device (110) for testing, in which the interface for the "Logic Link Control and Adaptation Protocol" (L2CAP) (112) with higher layers of the Bluetooth-Protocol stack are tested. The L2CAP (112) is placed in a test mode, such that messages for higher layers are diverted to a test device (10), the L2CAP (112) being placed in a test mode by means of a bluetooth message.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H04L 29/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H04L 12/28 (2006.01); H04L 12/26 (2006.01); H04L 12/56 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H04W 24/06 (2013.01); H04L 43/50 (2013.01); H04W 84/18 (2013.01); H04W 88/06 (2013.01); H04W 88/18 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0223858A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

WO 0223858 A1 20020321; DE 10045243 A1 20020328; EP 1317838 A1 20030611; JP 2004509525 A 20040325; US 2004042407 A1 20040304

INPADOC legal status


2005-11-16 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20050503

2004-05-26 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION)

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2004-01-28 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20031211

2003-07-23 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: MAESING, ROLAND

2003-07-23 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: NIEDER, STEFAN

2003-07-23 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: KARACELIK, HASAN

2003-06-11 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030307

2003-06-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR