Global Patent Index - EP 1317885 A1

EP 1317885 A1 2003-06-11 - Improved leek peeling machine

Title (en)

Improved leek peeling machine

Title (de)

Maschine zum Schälen von Porree

Title (fr)

Machine pour l'épluchage de poireaux

Publication

EP 1317885 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 02447222 A

Priority

  • BE 200100785 A
  • BE 200200424 A

Abstract (en)

Improved leek peeling machine (1) able to successively wash (3) the leek, cut it to size (13), brush out its roots (5), peel off its excess leaves (6), pull off the leaf remnants (7), without interruption, after which the leek is ready to be packed in cases (9). The complete installation consists of a feed belt (2), the leek peeling machine (1), an export conveyor (8), the cases (9), a discharge conveyor (10), an outside discharge conveyor (11) and a leaves discharge conveyor (15). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A23N 7/00; A23N 15/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A23N 7/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A23N 15/08 (2013.01); A23N 7/00 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE DE ES FR GB NL

EPO simple patent family

EP 1317885 A1 20030611; EP 1317885 B1 20080416; BE 1015020 A6 20040803; DE 60226114 D1 20080529; DE 60226114 T2 20090507; ES 2300428 T3 20080616

INPADOC legal status


2011-09-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091115

2011-07-29 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110322

2011-04-01 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20110401

2010-12-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091114

2010-11-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100601

2010-10-29 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091130

2010-10-29 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091130

2010-10-29 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100601

2010-08-27 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20100730

2010-07-28 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20091114

2010-06-23 [REG NL V1] LAPSED BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20100601

2010-05-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: VAN BEDTS, JAN

- Effective date: 20091130

2009-06-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20081201

- Year of fee payment: 7

2009-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20081201

- Year of fee payment: 7

2009-03-31 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20081128

- Year of fee payment: 7

2009-03-25 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20090119

2009-02-27 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20081128

- Year of fee payment: 7

2009-01-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20081128

- Year of fee payment: 7

2009-01-30 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20081130

- Year of fee payment: 7

2008-12-26 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2008-06-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2300428 T3

2008-05-29 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 60226114 P 20080529

2008-04-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): BE DE ES FR GB NL

2007-07-25 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20051214

2004-03-03 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): BE DE ES FR GB NL

2004-02-04 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20031208

2003-06-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE SK TR

2003-06-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI