Global Patent Index - EP 1317891 A1

EP 1317891 A1 2003-06-11 - Knocking type liquid container

Title (en)

Knocking type liquid container

Title (de)

Flüssigkeitsbehälter mit Druckknopf

Title (fr)

Récipient pour liquide à bouton-poussoir

Publication

EP 1317891 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 01310189 A

Priority

EP 01310189 A

Abstract (en)

A knock-type liquid container includes a body having a tank that holds a liquid, and an outlet provided at a forward end, a piston in the tank, and a piston-advancing mechanism having a knocking body that projects rearwardly of the body for advancing the piston forwardly when the knocking body is knocked in an axial direction of the container A rearward end surface of the rear cap that forms a rear end surface of the container, except the knocking body is not normal to the axial direction, but makes an angle other than an approximate right angle with the axial direction. A distance between a rear end surface of the knocking body at a non-knocking position and a rearmost portion of the rearward end surface of the container, except the knocking body, is less than a stroke of the knocking body required for advancing the piston. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A45D 34/04; A46B 11/00; B43K 8/00; B43K 8/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A45D 34/04 (2006.01); A46B 11/00 (2006.01); B43K 5/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B43K 5/06 (2013.01); A45D 34/042 (2013.01); A46B 11/0024 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

JP H01251919 A 19891006 - TOSHIBA CORP

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1317891 A1 20030611; EP 1317891 B1 20070131; DE 60126415 D1 20070322; DE 60126415 T2 20071108

INPADOC legal status


2018-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20171211

- Year of fee payment: 17

2008-01-09 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20071101

2007-03-22 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 60126415 P 20070322

2007-01-31 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE

2005-07-27 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20050614

2004-03-03 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE

2004-01-28 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20031202

2003-06-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2003-06-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI