Global Patent Index - EP 1317930 A1

EP 1317930 A1 2003-06-11 - Antithrombin for prevention and therapy of vascular proliferative diseases

Title (en)

Antithrombin for prevention and therapy of vascular proliferative diseases

Title (de)

Antithrombin zur Prävention und Therapie vaskuloproliferativer Erkrankungen

Title (fr)

Antithrombin pour prévention et traitement des maladies vasculaires prolifératives

Publication

EP 1317930 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 02024787 A

Priority

DE 10159556 A

Abstract (en)

The use of antithrombin (AT), especially AT III, is claimed in the prevention and/or therapy of vasculo-proliferative diseases. <??>An Independent claim is included for medicaments containing AT, especially AT III.

Abstract (de)

Antithrombin, insbesondere Antithrombin III, ist ein geeignetes Mittel bzw. Wirkstoff zur Prävention und/oder Therapie von vaskuloproliferativen Erkrankungen wie z.B. Transplantatvaskulopathie, Restenose, In-Stent-Restenose und pulmonale Hypertonie.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A61K 38/57; A61P 9/00; A61P 37/06; A61P 43/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A61K 38/55 (2006.01); A61K 38/57 (2006.01); A61P 9/00 (2006.01); A61P 9/12 (2006.01); A61P 11/00 (2006.01); A61P 37/06 (2006.01); A61P 43/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A61K 38/57 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

  • [X] WO 9958098 A2 19991118 - BOCK SUSAN C [US], et al
  • [Y] EP 1075840 A2 20010214 - AVENTIS BEHRING GMBH [DE]
  • [Y] WO 0020026 A2 20000413 - CHILDRENS HOSP MEDICAL CENTER [US]
  • [X] DATABASE BIOSIS [online] BIOSCIENCES INFORMATION SERVICE, PHILADELPHIA, PA, US; 1996, ALI M NADIR ET AL: "Inhibition of coronary restenosis by antithrombin III in atherosclerotic swine.", XP002224420, Database accession no. PREV199799383756 & CORONARY ARTERY DISEASE, vol. 7, no. 11, 1996, pages 851 - 861, ISSN: 0954-6928CORONARY ARTERY DISEASE19967110954-6928851861

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE SK TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1317930 A1 20030611; CA 2413315 A1 20030605; DE 10159556 A1 20030612; JP 2003183178 A 20030703; KR 20030046314 A 20030612; US 2003134796 A1 20030717

INPADOC legal status


2006-11-29 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20060601

2004-08-25 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: ZLB BEHRING GMBH

2004-03-03 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE SK TR

2004-02-04 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20031211

2003-06-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE SK TR

2003-06-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI