Global Patent Index - EP 1317946 A1

EP 1317946 A1 2003-06-11 - Hose for evacuation of persons

Title (en)

Hose for evacuation of persons

Title (de)

Schlauch zur Evakuierung von Menschen

Title (fr)

Tuyau destiné à l'évacuation de personnes

Publication

EP 1317946 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 02027035 A

Priority

DE 10160281 A

Abstract (en)

Rings (11-16) are axially spaced apart in the fabric of the tube. The rings are stacked inside each other to form a ridge (51-56) in the tube (20) and to reduce the axial packign volume as a result of uneven diameter. The tube is divided axially into conical or barrel-shaped segments (3-9) bordered by edging-rings (11,111,112). The segments' rings lie on circular cylinders.

Abstract (de)

Zur Minimierung des Packvolumens eines Schlauches (20) zur Evakuierung von Menschen aus gefährdeten Zonen ist eine Außenhaut (1) in Segmente (3-9) unterteilt. Jedes Segment (3-9) besitzt Ringe (11-16) zur Aussteifung der Außenhaut (1) in geöffnetem Zustand. Die Ringe (11-16) weisen untereinander ungleichen Durchmesser auf. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A62B 1/20

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A62B 1/20 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A62B 1/20 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

DE 19930350 A1 20010111 - DIEHL STIFTUNG & CO [DE]

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB NL SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1317946 A1 20030611; EP 1317946 B1 20040428; DE 10160281 A1 20030626; DE 10160281 B4 20050609; NO 20025806 A 20030610; NO 20025806 D0 20021203

INPADOC legal status


2008-10-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080701

2007-02-13 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20070213

- Year of fee payment: 5

2005-04-20 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20050131

2005-04-15 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2004-12-01 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

2004-10-27 [GBV] GB: EP PATENT (UK) TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID IN ACCORDANCE WITH GB SECTION 77(7)/1977

- Effective date: 20040428

2004-10-01 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2004-07-28 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040728

2004-06-03 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50200394 P 20040603

2004-06-02 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: GERMAN

2004-04-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB NL SE

2004-04-28 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2004-04-28 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040428

2004-04-28 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040428

2004-04-28 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040428

2004-03-03 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB NL SE

2003-06-11 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030307

2003-06-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE SI SK TR

2003-06-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO