Global Patent Index - EP 1317966 A2

EP 1317966 A2 2003-06-11 - Coating process and apparatus therefor

Title (en)

Coating process and apparatus therefor

Title (de)

Beschichtungsverfahren sowie Vorrichtung hierfür

Title (fr)

Procédé de revêtement et appareil pour sa mise en oeuvre

Publication

EP 1317966 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 02026209 A

Priority

DE 10159603 A

Abstract (en)

A coat is applied to one side of a base, esp. a thin metal foil with a thickness of 00,5 to 0,5mm. The foil is deformed in a defined manner, the coating is applied while the deformation is maintained, and this is then reversed. Deformation is applied at a process temperature, and is reversed at use or room temperature. It is carried out in a mechanical, thermal, pneumatic/hydraulic, electric, or magnetic means, or any combination of these, by a bimetal element, which forms or is connected to, the foil. The foil has anisotropic rigidity.

Abstract (de)

2. Die Erfindung betrifft ein Verfahren zum Aufbringen einer zumindest teilweisen Beschichtung (4) auf einen Grundkörper (1), wobei der Grundkörper (1) eine im wesentlichen flächenhafte Ausgestaltung in Bezug auf seine Längsabmessungen in Verhältnis zu seiner Dicke aufweist, insbesondere in Form einer dünnen Folie (2), wobei der Grundkörper (1) definiert verformt und anschließend die Beschichtung (4) im verformten Zustand des Grundkörpers (1) aufgebracht wird. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B05D 3/12; B05C 9/10; B05D 7/14

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B05D 3/12 (2006.01); B05D 7/14 (2006.01); C23C 4/02 (2006.01); C23C 26/00 (2006.01); C23C 26/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B05D 7/14 (2013.01); B05D 3/12 (2013.01); C23C 4/02 (2013.01); C23C 26/00 (2013.01); C23C 26/02 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE SK TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1317966 A2 20030611; EP 1317966 A3 20040211; DE 10159603 A1 20030626

INPADOC legal status


2013-04-10 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20120531

2004-12-15 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: BEHR GMBH & CO. KG

2004-12-08 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20041021

2004-11-03 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE SK TR

2004-10-13 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20040811

2004-02-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE SK TR

2004-02-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2004-02-11 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7B 05D 3/12 A

2004-02-11 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7B 05D 7/14 B

2004-02-11 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7B 05C 9/10 B

2003-06-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE SK TR

2003-06-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI