EP 1317966 A3 20040211 - Coating process and apparatus therefor
Title (en)
Coating process and apparatus therefor
Title (de)
Beschichtungsverfahren sowie Vorrichtung hierfür
Title (fr)
Procédé de revêtement et appareil pour sa mise en oeuvre
Publication
Application
Priority
DE 10159603 A 20011205
Abstract (en)
[origin: EP1317966A2] A coat is applied to one side of a base, esp. a thin metal foil with a thickness of 00,5 to 0,5mm. The foil is deformed in a defined manner, the coating is applied while the deformation is maintained, and this is then reversed. Deformation is applied at a process temperature, and is reversed at use or room temperature. It is carried out in a mechanical, thermal, pneumatic/hydraulic, electric, or magnetic means, or any combination of these, by a bimetal element, which forms or is connected to, the foil. The foil has anisotropic rigidity.
IPC 1-7
IPC 8 full level
B05D 3/12 (2006.01); B05D 7/14 (2006.01); C23C 4/02 (2006.01); C23C 26/00 (2006.01); C23C 26/02 (2006.01)
CPC (source: EP)
B05D 3/12 (2013.01); B05D 7/14 (2013.01); C23C 4/02 (2013.01); C23C 26/00 (2013.01); C23C 26/02 (2013.01)
Citation (search report)
- [X] DE 3200034 A1 19820722 - CENTRAL GLASS CO LTD [JP]
- [X] DE 19808518 C1 19990805 - ROCKWOOL MINERALWOLLE [DE]
- [X] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 0111, no. 65 (E - 510) 27 May 1987 (1987-05-27)
- [X] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 0124, no. 76 (E - 693) 13 December 1988 (1988-12-13)
- [XA] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 0040, no. 48 (E - 006) 12 April 1980 (1980-04-12)
Designated contracting state (EPC)
AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE SK TR
DOCDB simple family (publication)
EP 1317966 A2 20030611; EP 1317966 A3 20040211; DE 10159603 A1 20030626
DOCDB simple family (application)
EP 02026209 A 20021126; DE 10159603 A 20011205