Global Patent Index - EP 1317969 A1

EP 1317969 A1 2003-06-11 - Method and device for treating mineral materials such as soil or recycled material

Title (en)

Method and device for treating mineral materials such as soil or recycled material

Title (de)

Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Behandlung von mineralischen Stoffen wie Erde oder Recyclingmaterialien

Title (fr)

Dispositif et procédé de traitement de matériaux mineraux tels que des terres ou des matériaux de recuperation

Publication

EP 1317969 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 02292984 A

Priority

FR 0115874 A

Abstract (en)

The treatment plant has a hopper (5) to receive the raw mineral materials, such as earth, rubble from road surfacing or recycled concrete, at least one riddle (10) fed by an extractor (8), and at least one conveyor (12). The riddle (10) has a first section (10a) for separating a first fraction of the mineral material, situated above the first conveyor, and a second section (10b) for separating a second fraction of the material, located above a second conveyor (16) that has one end overlapping the end of the first conveyor (12). The riddle has star wheels or discs on shafts that are rotated at different speeds in its two sections.

Abstract (fr)

Le dispositif de traitement comporte une trémie (5) de réception de matériaux minéraux bruts, un extracteur (8) des matériaux contenus dans la trémie (5), au moins un crible (10) alimenté en matériaux minéraux bruts par l'extracteur (8) et au moins un premier transporteur (12) de matériaux minéraux séparés par le crible (10) disposé en-dessous d'une partie au moins du crible (10). Le crible (10) comporte un premier tronçon (10a) de séparation d'une première fraction granulométrique des matériaux minéraux disposé au-dessus du premier transporteur (12) et au moins un second tronçon (10b) de séparation d'une seconde fraction granulométrique des matériaux minéraux disposé à la suite du premier tronçon (10a) dans la direction longitudinale (11) et au moins un second transporteur (16) disposé en-dessous du second tronçon (10b) du crible (10), comportant une extrémité disposée au-dessus du premier transporteur (12). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B07B 1/15; B07B 1/00; E01C 21/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B07B 1/00 (2006.01); B07B 1/15 (2006.01); E01C 21/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B07B 1/005 (2013.01); B07B 1/15 (2013.01); E01C 21/00 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CZ DE ES FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1317969 A1 20030611; EP 1317969 B1 20060308; DE 60209679 D1 20060504; FR 2833194 A1 20030613; FR 2833194 B1 20040924

INPADOC legal status


2015-11-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20141231

2015-09-25 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20150831

2014-02-28 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20131212

- Year of fee payment: 12

2008-04-30 [PG25 CZ] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CZ

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060308

2007-02-14 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20061211

2006-10-04 [GBV] GB: EP PATENT (UK) TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID IN ACCORDANCE WITH GB SECTION 77(7)/1977

- Effective date: 20060308

2006-06-19 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060619

2006-06-09 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060609

2006-05-04 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 60209679 P 20060504

2006-03-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): CZ DE ES FR GB IT

2006-03-08 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2006-03-08 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060308

2006-03-08 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060308

2004-10-20 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20040902

2004-03-03 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): CZ DE ES FR GB IT

2004-02-04 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20031205

2003-06-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE SI SK TR

2003-06-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO