Global Patent Index - EP 1317970 A1

EP 1317970 A1 2003-06-11 - Screening apparatus

Title (en)

Screening apparatus

Title (de)

Siebvorrichtung

Title (fr)

Dispositif de tamisage

Publication

EP 1317970 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 02026649 A

Priority

IT MI20012570 A

Abstract (en)

The present invention relates to a screening apparatus for processing fractions deriving from working processes in general, comprising a screening section (3) for screening materials into an under-screening fraction, comprising products passing through the screening ports, and an over-screening fraction, comprising polluting materials which do not pass through the screening ports. The screening section comprises an air section for supplying air through the screening ports to prevent the polluting materials from passing through said screening ports. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B07B 4/08; B07B 1/15

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B07B 1/15 (2006.01); B07B 4/08 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B07B 1/15 (2013.01); B07B 4/08 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE SK TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1317970 A1 20030611; IT MI20012570 A1 20030605

INPADOC legal status


2006-12-06 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20060613

2004-06-09 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20040423

2004-03-03 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE SK TR

2003-10-01 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030731

2003-06-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE SK TR

2003-06-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI