Global Patent Index - EP 1317973 A2

EP 1317973 A2 2003-06-11 - Deep drawing press

Title (en)

Deep drawing press

Title (de)

Tiefziehpresse

Title (fr)

Presse d'emboutissage profond

Publication

EP 1317973 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 02027116 A

Priority

DE 10160410 A

Abstract (en)

The deep-drawing press has a holder (2) for the workpiece sheet at the press side with sheet holder segments (13,14) at the end sides, which are inserted flush with the surface. They slide horizontally along a common axis, with their facing sides set to the contour of the replaced tool. The holder (8) for the workpiece sheet at the tool side is fitted to the workpiece holder segments in an exchange mounting, and is supported outside the segments. An intermediate force transfer unit is between the ram (1) and the upper tool, with a center pressure section (17) fixed to the ram and two pressure sections (18,19) which slide in the same direction with the sheet holder segments, set to the contour of the upper tool.

Abstract (de)

Bei einer Presse zum Tiefziehen mit einem von einem Stößel (1) bewegten Werkzeug-Oberteil, einem gleichsinnig bewegten, pressenseitigen Blechhalter (2) und einem die Platine randseitig abstützenden Werkzeug-Unterteil können Werkzeug-Oberteil und -Unterteil gegen Werkzeuge anderer Kontur ausgewechselt werden, wobei dem Werkzeug-Oberteil ein dessen Kontur folgender werkzeugseitiger Blechhalter (2) auswechselbar zugeordnet ist. Ein konstruktiv und montagetechnisch einfacher Aufbau bei gleichzeitig optimierter Führung der Blechhaltekraft wird dadurch erreicht, daß der pressenseitige Blechhalter in seine Stirnseite flächenbündig eingelassene Blechhalter-Segmente aufweist, die entlang einer gemeinsamen Achse horizontal verschiebbar und mit ihren einander zugekehrten Seiten auf die Kontur der eingewechselten Werkzeuge einstellbar sind, und daß der zugehörige werkzeugseitige Blechhalter zumindest an den Blechhalter-Segmenten auswechselbar befestigt ist. Ferner sind zwischen Stößel und Werkzeug-Oberteil ein dieses aufnehmendes stößelfestes Druckstück und auf die Werkzeugkontur einstellbare Druckstücke vorgesehen.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B21D 22/22

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B21D 22/22 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B21D 22/22 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE SI SK TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1317973 A2 20030611; EP 1317973 A3 20041006; DE 10160410 A1 20030618

INPADOC legal status


2006-03-01 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20050407

2005-08-04 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2005-06-29 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2004-10-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE SI SK TR

2004-10-06 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO

2003-06-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE SI SK TR

2003-06-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO