Global Patent Index - EP 1317975 A1

EP 1317975 A1 2003-06-11 - Device for producing stretched wire

Title (en)

Device for producing stretched wire

Title (de)

Vorrichtung zum Herstellen von gerecktem Draht

Title (fr)

Dispositif pour la fabrication de fil etiré

Publication

EP 1317975 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 01811192 A

Priority

EP 01811192 A

Abstract (en)

The appliance has two clamp devices (24,28) at a distance to each other. At least one device (24) is moveable through a stretching distance, and one device has a sensor to detect wire tension. A roller straightening machine (22) is located on the intake side, followed in advance direction of the wire, by a first roller advance (23), a first clamp device, a straightening section (32), a second roller advance, and a second clamp device. The first clamp device is located on a linear hydraulic power intensifier (25). The sensor is a pressure cell located on the stationary clamp device (28). A control unit adjusts the stretching length dependent upon wire tension.

Abstract (de)

Eine Reckmaschine (21) zum Herstellen von diskontinuierlich gerecktem Draht (31) umfasst ein Rollenrichtwerk (22), eine erste Rollenvorschubeinheit (23), eine erste Klemmvorrichtung (24), welche auf einem hydraulischen Linearverstärker (25) verfahrbar ist, und eine zweite Klemmvorrichtung (28), an welcher eine Schneidvorrichtung (29) angegliedert ist. Ein eingeschobener, zu reckender Walzdraht (31) wird von dem Rollenrichtwerk (22) vorgerichtet und durch die erste Rollenvorschubeinheit (23) bis zur zweiten Klemmvorrichtung (28) vorgeschoben. Anschliessend wird der Draht (31) von den beiden Klemmvorrichtungen (24 und 28) gehalten, wobei die erste Klemmvorrichtung (24) gegen die Einschubrichtung um einen Reckgrad verfahren wird und den Walzdraht entsprechend kaltverformt. Mit der Vorrichtung wird ein günstiges Streckgrenzverhältnis erreicht, wobei die Dehneigenschaften erhalten bleiben. Mit einem Sensor werden die Endwerte z. B. der Stahlspannung erfasst, abgespeichert und für die weitere Produktion der gereckten Drähte verwendet. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B21F 9/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B21C 51/00 (2006.01); B21C 37/04 (2006.01); B21F 9/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B21F 9/00 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

  • [YA] DE 19705945 A1 19980820 - BESTA EISEN UND STAHLHANDELSGE [DE]
  • [Y] DE 2523406 A1 19761216 - SCHMITZ SOEHNE GMBH J H
  • [A] GB 1397529 A 19750611 - SCHLOEMANN SIEMAG AG
  • [A] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 1996, no. 12 26 December 1996 (1996-12-26)
  • [A] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 014, no. 042 (M - 0925) 25 January 1990 (1990-01-25)
  • [A] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 1995, no. 06 31 July 1995 (1995-07-31)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1317975 A1 20030611; CA 2411623 A1 20030607; JP 2003236609 A 20030826; US 2003121304 A1 20030703

INPADOC legal status


2004-09-29 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20031212

2004-04-08 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2004-03-03 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2003-06-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2003-06-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI