Global Patent Index - EP 1317976 A2

EP 1317976 A2 2003-06-11 - Device for the manufacture of stretched wire

Title (en)

Device for the manufacture of stretched wire

Title (de)

Vorrichtung zum Herstellen von gerecktem Draht

Title (fr)

Dispositif pour la fabrication de fil étiré

Publication

EP 1317976 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 02406050 A

Priority

  • EP 02406050 A
  • EP 01811192 A

Abstract (en)

The appliance has two clamp devices. At least one of the devices is moveable through one stretching distance, and at least one has a sensor to detect wire tension. A roller straightening machine (22) is located on the intake side of the appliance, followed in advance direction of the wire, by a first roller advance (23), a first clamp device (24), a straightening section (32), and a second clamp device (28). The first clamp device is located on a linear hydraulic power intensifier (25). The sensor is a pressure cell located on the stationary clamp device. A control unit adjusts stretching length dependent upon measured wire tension.

Abstract (de)

Eine Reckmaschine (21) zum Herstellen von diskontinuierlich gerecktem Draht (31) umfasst ein Rollenrichtwerk (22), eine erste Rollenvorschubeinheit (23), eine erste Klemmvorrichtung (24), welche auf einem hydraulischen Linearverstärker (25) verfahrbar ist, und eine zweite Klemmvorrichtung (28), an welcher eine Schneidvorrichtung (29) angegliedert ist. Ein eingeschobener, zu reckender Walzdraht (31) wird von dem Rollenrichtwerk (22) vorgerichtet und durch die erste Rollenvorschubeinheit (23) bis zur zweiten Klemmvorrichtung (28) vorgeschoben. Anschliessend wird der Draht (31) von den beiden Klemmvorrichtungen (24 und 28) gehalten, wobei die erste Klemmvorrichtung (24) gegen die Einschubrichtung um einen Reckgrad verfahren wird und den Walzdraht entsprechend kaltverformt. Mit der Vorrichtung wird ein günstiges Streckgrenzverhältnis erreicht, wobei die Dehneigenschaften erhalten bleiben. Mit einem Sensor werden die Endwerte z. B. der Stahlspannung erfasst, abgespeichert und für die weitere Produktion der gereckten Drähte verwendet. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B21F 9/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B21F 9/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B21F 9/00 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE SI SK TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1317976 A2 20030611; EP 1317976 A3 20040630

INPADOC legal status


2008-09-03 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20080311

2005-03-23 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE SI SK TR

2004-11-03 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20040824

2004-06-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE SI SK TR

2004-06-30 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO

2003-06-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE SI SK TR

2003-06-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI